Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: Ronald C Griffin
Case #: 7:24-cv-00157
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 3:42 AM CST
Defendant
Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.
Represented By
Laura E. De Santos
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Nellie Gomez Hooper
Nellie G Hooper
contact info
Plaintiff
Karisma Anderson
Moore & Associates 440 LOUISIANA ST STE 1110
HOUSTON, TX 77002
Represented By
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info
Rochelle Owens
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 03/12 10:33 AM
Text Order GRANTING17 Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. It is ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: 1) The discovery deadline is extended from March 21, 2025, to May 21, 2025. 2) The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended from April 21, 2025, to June 24, 2025. 3) It is further ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Hearing is RESET to October 10, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. and 4) Jury Selection/Trial is RESET to November 3, 2025, at 8:00 a.m. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/12 11:39 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 5/21/2025 , Motions due by 6/24/2025 , Jury Selection/Trial REset for 11/3/2025 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Final Pretrial Conference REset for 10/10/2025 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts (kg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
17 17 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 03/11 12:46 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Agreed Stipulation Extending Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines by Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (Hooper, Nellie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 misc Pretrial Disclosures Mon 01/06 2:36 PM
Pretrial Disclosures Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses by Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.. (Hooper, Nellie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
15 15 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Thu 09/19 10:48 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.. (Hooper, Nellie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/17 12:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2025 03:00 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection/Trail set for 9/2/2025 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2024 , Discovery due by 3/21/2025 , Joinder of Parties due by 12/17/2024 , Motions due by 4/21/2025 . Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 09/16 2:42 PM
Scheduling Recommendations by Karisma Anderson. (Owens, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 09/04 1:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Karisma Anderson. (Owens, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/20 3:22 PM
ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Tue 08/20 3:21 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 08/19 3:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties Defendant's Certificate of Interested Parties by Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.. (Hooper, Nellie)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/19 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses . Attorney Nellie Gomez Hooper added to party Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.(pty:dft) by Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc..(Hooper, Nellie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 07/29 2:21 PM
Acknowledgment of Service returned by Karisma Anderson. Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc. served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/28/2024. (Owens, Rochelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 07/15 8:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc. (je3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/15 5:10 PM
Text Order GRANTING4 Rochelle Owens' Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Ms. Owens has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 07/12 4:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Hampel Oil Distributors, Inc.. (kg)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/12 4:14 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Moore Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rochelle Owens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18979353) by on behalf of Karisma Anderson.(Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 07/12 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Moore on behalf of Karisma Anderson (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/12 3:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Karisma Anderson. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/12 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18979065), filed by Karisma Anderson.(Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/12 4:50 PM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts and Judge Ronald C. Griffin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE.. Referral Judge: Ronald C. Griffin. (kg)
Related: [-]