Washington Western District Court
Judge:Lauren King
Case #: 2:24-cv-01044
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, 24-00002-12991-0 SEA
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 1:35 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Potbelly Sandwich Works LLC
Represented By
Ryan R Jones
Fisher & Phillips Llp (wa)
contact info
Catharine M Morisset
Fisher & Phillips Llp (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Sound Sandwich LLC
Represented By
Aaron D Bigby
Northcraft Bigby Daniels PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Iarjamanni Jones
Represented By
Brian Walter Denlinger
Ackermann & Tilajef, P.C.
contact info
Craig J. Ackermann
Ackermann And Tilajef PC
contact info
Avi Kreitenberg
Ackermann And Tilajef PC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Russell Norman
Represented By
Brian Walter Denlinger
Ackermann & Tilajef, P.C.
contact info
Craig J. Ackermann
Ackermann And Tilajef PC
contact info
Avi Kreitenberg
Ackermann And Tilajef PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/30 4:54 PM
***Civil Case Terminated re22 Order Granting21 Stipulated Motion to Remand. (APH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 misc Remand Letter Fri 03/21 4:57 PM
LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (APH) (cc: letter, remand order, and docket sheet to King County Superior Court via USPS)
Related: [-]
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Fri 03/21 4:38 PM
ORDER granting21 Stipulated Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (TE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 motion Remand Mon 03/17 12:06 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Remand AND [PROPOSED] ORDER , filed by Plaintiffs Iarjamanni Jones, James Russell Norman. Noting Date 3/17/2025, (Ackermann, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
20 20 misc Joint Status Report Fri 02/07 12:00 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Filed by Plaintiffs Iarjamanni Jones, James Russell Norman.(Ackermann, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Fri 01/03 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Aaron D Bigby. Filed by Defendant Sound Sandwich LLC. (Bigby, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
18 18 order 2 - Minute Order Thu 12/26 12:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Pursuant to the Court's16 Order Granting Stipulation for Stay, the Court GRANTS the parties' request to continue the stay this case until February 7, 2025 "to finalize and execute their memorandum of understanding and formal settlement agreement." Dkt. No.17 at 1-2. To the extent settlement will not be finalized by this date, the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint status report on or before February 7, 2025. (NAW)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Joint Status Report Thu 12/26 11:12 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4-5. (Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/03 10:12 AM
ORDER granting Parties'15 Stipulated MOTION for Stay. The Court STAYS the case and ORDERS the parties to submit a joint status report within 14 days of the date of their mediation. The Court also STRIKES Plaintiffs' motion to remand, Dkt. No.13 , without prejudice to refiling if this matter is not resolved during the stay. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Fri 08/30 2:26 PM
Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order for Stay , filed by Defendants Potbelly Sandwich Works LLC, Sound Sandwich LLC. Noting Date 8/30/2024, (Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
14 14 order 2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/16 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. The Court STRIKES the deadlines listed in the Court's12 Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report. If necessary, the Court will reset the deadlines upon resolution of Plaintiffs'13 Motion to Remand. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
13 13 motion Remand Mon 08/12 2:25 PM
MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiffs Iarjamanni Jones, James Russell Norman. Noting Date 9/9/2024, (Ackermann, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Wed 07/17 11:58 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/14/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2024, Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2024. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
11 11 order LK Standing Order for All Civil Cases (FORM) Wed 07/17 11:51 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Standing Order
10 10 order LK Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Wed 07/17 11:50 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
9 9 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Tue 07/16 4:18 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Joinder into Motion Tue 07/16 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Joinder JOINING1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Sound Sandwich, LLC. (Bigby, Aaron)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 07/16 4:09 PM
Judge Lauren King added. (RE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
7 7 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 7:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Sound Sandwich, LLC. (Bigby, Aaron)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 07/15 7:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal by Sound Sandwich, LLC.(Bigby, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 07/12 7:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal by Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC.(Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 07/12 7:38 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Potbelly Corporation for Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC. (Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 07/12 7:35 PM
DECLARATION of Catharine M. Morisset re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC (Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Fri 07/12 6:55 PM
DECLARATION of Brandi Adams re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC (Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/12 6:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-12991 0 SEA; Related [+] filed by Potbelly Sandwich Works, LLC.(Morisset, Catharine)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8543738
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Complaint