Utah District Court
Judge:Howard C Nielson, Jr
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 1:24-cv-00119
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 2:30 AM MST
Defendant
Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service
Represented By
Nathan R. Marigoni
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
Angela Shewan
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
A. N.
Represented By
Brent J. Newton
Brian S King PC
contact info
Samuel Martin Hall
Brian S King PC
contact info
Brian S. King
Brian S King PC
contact info
Andrew James Somers
Brian S King PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Medical Service
Terminated: 10/07/2024
Represented By
Angela Shewan
Troutman Pepper
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
17 17 respm Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion Tue 01/07 9:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service. (Marigoni, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/20 5:03 PM
Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff A. N..(King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Appeal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Related Brief from Anthem
Thursday, December 12, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/12 11:49 AM
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Extend Deadlines to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 12/12/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/11 2:19 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time responses to motion to dismiss complaint filed by Plaintiff A. N.. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order extending deadlines to respond to motion to dismiss complaint
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 11/13 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service.(Marigoni, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 11/06 2:47 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time: The deadline for Anthem to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF 1 ) is hereby extended to November 13, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 11/6/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/05 1:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Shewan, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/08 12:12 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint: The deadline for Defendants Answer to the Complaint is extended to up to and including November 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 10/8/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/07 9:48 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service. Motions referred to Cecilia M. Romero.(Shewan, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Mon 10/07 9:41 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service identifying Elevance Health, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Shewan, Angela)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan R. Marigoni on behalf of Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service (Marigoni, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/08 2:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by A. N. (King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
misc Received Consent /Reassignment Form Mon 08/05 10:12 AM
RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiff A. N.. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Fri 07/26 12:23 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/26/2024. (haa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 07/25 1:49 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 7/25/24. (dle)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 07/15 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice emailed or mailed to Plaintiff A. N.. (Notice generated by Clerk's Office) Form due by 8/5/2024. (sg)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 07/15 9:26 AM
Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr added. Case number will now read 1:24-cv-00119-HCN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 07/12 11:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service Inc. d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5123683) filed by A.N., individually and on behalf of N.N. a minor,. (King, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet