New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00425
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Jaime Lan (1)
Represented By
Louis V. Fasulo
Fasulo Giordano & Dimaggio, Llp.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Meredith Foster
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/13/2024 4:09 AM EDT
Friday, February 02, 2024
1 1 Sealed Complaint as to Jaime Lan (1). Violations of 18 U.S.C. §§ 666 and 1951. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
Arrest of Jaime Lan. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jaime Lan. Attorney Louis V. Fasulo for Jaime Lan added. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jaime Lan. Louis Fasulo appointed counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein) (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Initial Appearance as to Jaime Lan held on 2/6/2024. Bond Hearing as to Jaime Lan held on 2/6/2024. Defendant present with CJA Louis Fasulo. AUSA Meredith Foster present. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $50,000 personal recognizance bond; Co-signed by one financially responsible person; Travel restricted to SDNY, EDNY, DNJ and the defendant's district of residence; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; No contact by the defendant or anyone at the defendant's direction with any person deft knows or has reason to know is a current or former NYCHA contractor outside the presence of counsel; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by February 20, 2024. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 3/7/24. On defendant's consent. See Transcript. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Appearance Bond Entered as to Jaime Lan: $50,000 personal recognizance bond; Co-signed by one financially responsible person by February 20, 2024; additional conditions... (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
6 6 ORDER as to Jaime Lan: Upon the application of the United States of America dated February 5, 2024, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed (1) to unseal the complaints in each of the cases listed in Exhibit A to the Government's February 5, 2024 letter and file them on the public docket, and (2) to file this Order and the Government's February 5, 2024 letter and its three Exhibits on the public docket of each of those cases. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/6/2024) (ap) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 LETTER by USA as to Jaime Lan addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Catherine Ghosh / Jerry Fang / Sheb Swett / Meredith Foster / Jacob Fiddelman dated 2/5/2024 re: The Government writes regarding bail conditions. Document filed by USA. (Exhibits attached). (ap) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
8 8 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jaime Lan. Time excluded from 3/4/24 until 4/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/4/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Jaime Lan re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jaime Lan. Time excluded from 4/5/24 until 5/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/5/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Jaime Lan re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jaime Lan. Time excluded from 5/6/2024 until 6/7/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 5/6/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Jaime Lan re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
14 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jaime Lan re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. Time excluded from 6/6/24 until 7/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/6/24)(vb) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIRMATION of Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Jaime Lan re:14 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (vb) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
16 16 ENDORSED LETTER as to Jaime Lan addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave from Louis V. Fasulo dated 6/11/2024 re: Bail Modification. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Mr. Lan may: (1) travel to/from Florida to visit his mother-in-law and sister, but must provide PTS his itinerary in advance, contact information and address in Florida during his stay, and contact his PTS officer on his return. (2) travel into Pennsylvania as needed, but must notify his PTS officer in advance if he will be in Pennsylvania on a specific date. SO ORDERED... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave on 6/11/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
17 17 ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Jaime Lan. Time excluded from 7/8/2024 until 8/7/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/8/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
18 18 AFFIRMATION of AUSA Sheb Swett in Support by USA as to Jaime Lan re:17 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00510-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Jaime Lan. (jm)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Change of Plea Hearing as to Jaime Lan held on 7/10/2024. Defendant Jaime Lan present with attorney Louis Fasulo. AUSA Meredith Foster present. Defendant waives indictment, and enters a plea of GUILTY to Count One of Information 24cr 425 (KPF). Plea accepted. PSR ordered. Sentencing set for October 17, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. Defendant's sentencing submission due two weeks prior to sentencing. Government's sentencing submission due one week prior to sentencing. Defendant continued released, bail conditions still apply. (Sentencing set for 10/17/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla) (Court Reporter Devon Gerber) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Plea entered by Jaime Lan (1) Guilty as to Count 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
Oral Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Jaime Lan. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/10/2024) (ap)
Related: [-]
19 19 INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Jaime Lan (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
21 21 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Jaime Lan. (jm)
Related: [-]