Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00329
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 2:33 AM CDT
Defendant
Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD
Federal Public Defender-Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William F. Calve
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/13/2024 3:34 AM CDT
Friday, June 21, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez (1). (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
2 2 GOVT'S MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond, MOTION to Continue by USA as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez. (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez held on 6/21/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.) (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond Pending Hearing as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez, ( Detention Hearing/Preliminary Hearing set for 6/26/2024 03:00 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD appearing for Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez . Attorney David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD added to party Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez(pty:dft) (Kimmelman - FPD, David) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad:Preliminary Hearing as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez held on 6/26/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Detention Hearing as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez held on 6/26/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR-Gold.) (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond Pending Trial as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez, Motions terminated as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez:2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond MOTION to Continue filed by USA.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (wg) [5:24-mj-00918-ESC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Luis Alberto Hernandez Ramirez (bot2)
Related: [-]