Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01428
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 2:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Merary Cruz-Nustas (1)
Represented By
Rebecca R. Reyes
Rebecca Reyes Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shuhao Wang
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/13/2024 3:41 AM CDT
Sunday, June 16, 2024
Arrest of Merary Cruz-Nustas (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Merary Cruz-Nustas. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Rebecca R. Reyes for Merary Cruz-Nustas appointed. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Merary Cruz-Nustas. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Merary Cruz-Nustas. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Merary Cruz-Nustas held on 6/17/2024; Interpreter: E. Gallegos (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Merary Cruz-Nustas (Court Reporter ero.) (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Merary Cruz-Nustas, ( Detention Hearing set for 6/20/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda; Preliminary Hearing set for 6/20/2024 03:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Merary Cruz-Nustas. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Shuhao Wang appearing for USA. . Attorney Shuhao Wang added to party USA(pty:pla) (Wang, Shuhao) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Merary Cruz-Nustas (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Detained Without Bond as to Merary Cruz-Nustas. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em) [3:24-mj-02487-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Castaneda (bot1)
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Merary Cruz-Nustas (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Merary Cruz-Nustas (bot2)
Related: [-]