California Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-08599
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 13, 2024 12:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Holly A Sullivan
Federal Defenders Of San Diego Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Edith Olivia Valenzuela (2)
Represented By
Andrew D. Williams
Williams & Singh, LLP
contact info
Alana Lee McMains
Law Office Of Alana Mcmains
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Schulberg
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/13/2024 1:21 AM PDT
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
Arrest of Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis, Edith Olivia Valenzuela (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis, Edith Olivia Valenzuela. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 7/11/2024 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/25/2024 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 8/8/2024 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr..(vyc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/11/2024) (vyc). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/11/2024) (vyc).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jessica Schulberg appearing for USA. (Schulberg, Jessica)Attorney Jessica Schulberg added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
3 3 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis, Edith Olivia Valenzuela (no document attached) (cxl)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis, Edith Olivia Valenzuela held on 7/11/2024. Proffer, Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis,Alana Lee McMains,Andrew D. Williams for Edith Olivia Valenzuela. Bond set as to Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, 10% cash deposit and Edith Olivia Valenzuela (2) $15,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, 10% cash deposit. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/25/2024 at 1:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 8/8/2024 at 1:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(CD# 7/11/2024 LR2024 1:14-1:24; 1:14-1:28). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney Jo Anne Tyrell). (cxl)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 7/11/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Edith Olivia Valenzuela (2) $15,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 7/11/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Edith Olivia Valenzuela: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 7/11/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER as to Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 7/11/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Edith Olivia Valenzuela (cxl)
Related: [-]
13 13 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Malcolm Angel Tapia-Llopis (cxl)
Related: [-]