California Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-00079
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 12:15 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Caily Nelson, GOVT
Doj-Usao
contact info
Kerry Blackburn, GOVT
Doj-Crm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alfredo Albor (2)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Shari G. Rusk
Law Office Of Shari Rusk
contact info
Defendant
Jose Federico Angulo Barrera (3)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Toni LaShay White
Law Office Of Toni White
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Wesley Blackwood (1)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Christopher Richard Cosca
Cosca Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Victor Alfonso Calderon (5)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Etan Zaitsu
Zaitsu Law
contact info
Defendant
Albaro Alberto Gonzalez Moreno (7)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Betty Jean Williams
Law Office Of Williams & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
Dulce Medina (4)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Danica Mazenko
D Mazenko Law
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Suarez (6)
Terminated: 07/02/2024
Represented By
Kyle Rodger Knapp
Kyle R. Knapp, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/14/2024 12:48 AM PDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
2 2 AO257 (Sealed) as to Jacob Wesley Blackwood, Albor Alfredo, Jose Federico Angulo Barrera, Dulce Medina, Victor Alfonso Calderon, Jesus Suarez, Albaro Alberto Gonzalez Moreno (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/14/24 as to Jacob Wesley Blackwood, Albor Alfredo, Jose Federico Angulo Barrera, Dulce Medina, Victor Alfonso Calderon, Jesus Suarez, Albaro Alberto Gonzalez Moreno. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]