Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-01358
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kristen A. Kearney
United States Attorney'S Office Ma
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Vinicius Souza Diniz (1)
Terminated: 06/14/2024
Represented By
Francis T. O'Brien, Jr.
O'Brien Law Boston, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/14/2024 3:50 AM EDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
Arrest (Rule 5) of Vinicius Souza Diniz (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
1 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Vinicius Souza Diniz. Initial Appearance - Rule 5 set for 6/14/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 23 (In person only) before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Vinicius Souza Diniz; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]
3 3 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Vinicius Souza Diniz(Russo, Noreen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2024) (Russo, Noreen).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Francis T. O'Brien, Jr appearing for Vinicius Souza Diniz. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
5 5 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Vinicius Souza Diniz held on 6/14/2024. The court informs the def't of the charges against him out of the District of Kansas and his rights. Francis O'Brien enters his appearance for the def't. The gov't is not moving for detention. The def't waives his identity hearing. The court releases the def't on conditions and he is directed to appear 6/24/24 at 1:30 PM at the Topeka Federal Courthouse. Def't released. (Attorneys present: Kearney O'Brien, Skehill USPO. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at[LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
6 6 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Vinicius Souza Diniz. (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs WAIVER of Rule 5 and 5.1 Hearings by Vinicius Souza Diniz (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMOVAL to District of Kansas as to Vinicius Souza Diniz (Russo, Noreen)
Related: [-]