Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00884
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2024
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 14, 2024 2:26 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno (1)
Terminated: 06/14/2024


Docket last updated: 07/14/2024 3:07 AM CDT
Friday, June 14, 2024
Proceedings Complete in Arresting Division as to Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno. Documents to be downloaded by Charging Division. (rqr)
Related: [-]
1 1 Arrest - Within District as to Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno for case number DR:21-CR-00053(1)-AM in our district. (rqr)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance on Revocation Proceedings as to Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno held on 6/14/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
4 4 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT/DIVISION as to Uziel Jonathan Hernandez-Moreno. Defendant committed to WD/TX, Del Rio Division.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rqr)
Related: [-]