Member Case
Lead case is: 2:24-bk-20846

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:24-bk-20848
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2024
Dismissed:Dec 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.
312 Covered Bridge Ln
Cherry Log, GA 30522-2059
Represented By
Will B. Geer
Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Friday, January 24, 2025
misc 06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed Fri 01/24 12:56 PM
Case Closed (jwc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
45 45 misc Certificate of Mailing Mon 01/06 1:03 PM
Certificate of Mailing. (3 notices mailed.) Related [+] (jwc)
Related: [-] 44
44 44 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (PDF Order) Mon 01/06 9:45 AM
Order Dismissing Case. Service by BNC Entered on 1/6/2025. (jwc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
43 43 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Tue 12/03 9:18 AM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-20848 jrs for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Regions DIP
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
42 42 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 10/30 1:00 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-20848 jrs for the Month Ending: 09/31/2024 filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bank Statement
Friday, October 18, 2024
41 41 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 10/18 3:12 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-20848 for the Month Ending: 08/31/2024 filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bank Statement I
Att: 2 Exhibit Bank Statement II
Thursday, August 29, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/29 3:56 PM
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance, Request for Service of Papers and Reservation of Rights Filed by Matthew W. Levin on behalf of Renee Thorne, Vernon Thorne. (Levin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
misc Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded Thu 08/29 8:20 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held and concluded (jwc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
39 39 misc P-Declaration of Debtor Tue 08/27 9:13 PM
Amended 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, August 22, 2024
38 38 misc P-Corporate Resolution Thu 08/22 12:27 PM
Corporate Resolution filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Wed 08/21 6:17 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 24-20848 for the Month Ending: 07/31/2024 filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Bank Statement
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
36 36 misc 0-Certificate of Service Tue 08/20 12:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Debtor's Third Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 33
Sunday, August 18, 2024
35 35 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules (441) Mon 08/19 12:46 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules Notice Date 08/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
34 34 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Assignment of Hearing (165) Sat 08/17 1:45 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Hearing Notice Date 08/16/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Extend Time to File Schedules, Motion to Fri 08/16 11:49 AM
Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 8/16/2024. Schedule(s) due by 8/20/2024, (ggd)
Related: [-] 29
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
32 32 misc Notice of Hearing/Rescheduled Hearing (BK) Wed 08/14 8:58 AM
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Third Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs (doc #29). Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 8/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta. Related [+] (kog)
Related: [-] 29
31 31 misc P-Amended List of Creditors (FEE) Wed 08/14 8:48 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual Debtor , Schedule A/B , Schedule D , Schedule E/F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor , Equity Security Holders , Statement of Financial Affairs , Amended List of Creditors (creditors added by upload) Fee Amount $ 34,, Attorney Disclosure Statement filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 08/14 7:25 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Debtor's Second Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 27
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Wed 08/14 8:48 AM
Receipt of Amended List of Creditors (FEE)([LINK 24-20848 jrs] ) [misc,952] ( 34.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A61621879. Fee Amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#31
misc Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued Thu 08/15 10:19 AM
Section 341(a) meeting held but continued for production of additional documents or information 341 Meeting to be held on 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 866-643-3080 and enter participation code 1614372. (11 Gain) (jwc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
29 29 motion Extend Time to File Schedules, Application to Tue 08/13 10:33 PM
Third Application to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 27
Saturday, August 10, 2024
28 28 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules (441) Sun 08/11 12:45 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules Notice Date 08/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
27 27 order Extend Time to File Schedules, Motion to Thu 08/08 2:41 PM
Order GRANTING Second Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 8/8/2024. Schedule(s) due by 8/13/2024, (jwc)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
26 26 motion Extend Time to File Schedules, Application to Wed 08/07 10:04 PM
Second Application to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 22
Friday, August 02, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules (441) Sat 08/03 12:52 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Extend Time to File Schedules Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 08/02 10:29 AM
Certificate of Service of First Day Orders filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 14 ,16
23 23 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 08/02 8:52 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
22 22 order Extend Time to File Schedules, Motion to Wed 07/31 1:44 PM
Order GRANTING Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 7/31/2024. Schedule(s) due by 8/7/2024, (ggd)
Related: [-] 21
Monday, July 29, 2024
21 21 motion Extend Time to File Schedules, Application to Mon 07/29 9:51 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, July 26, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 5:01 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Anna Green Cross on behalf of Estate of Cindy Davis. (Cross, Anna)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Alexandria E. Seay on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Seay, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/22 5:27 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Henry F. Sewell Jr. on behalf of Estate of Cindy Davis. (Sewell, Henry)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Mon 07/22 8:56 AM
An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below under Case No. 24-20846 The docket in Case No. 24-20846 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Case No. 24-20845 Case No. 24-20846 Case No. 24-20847 and Case No. 24-20848 (jwc)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Joint Administration, Motion for Mon 07/22 7:45 AM
Order GRANTING Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] Service by Debtor's Counsel. Entered on 7/22/2024. (jwc)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, July 21, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Mon 07/22 12:49 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 order 01-Order Fri 07/19 8:03 AM
Interim Order Granting Emergency Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts. Service by BNC. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 7/19/2024. Related [+] (ggd)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, July 18, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Set Hearing Fri 07/19 12:56 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Set Hearing Notice Date 07/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Fri 07/19 12:56 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 07/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc 0-Certificate of Service Thu 07/18 8:34 AM
Certificate of Service of First Day Pleadings filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6 ,9
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Thu 07/18 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
9 9 order Set Hearing, Motion to Tue 07/16 1:06 PM
Order GRANTING Debtor's Motion to Set Expedited Hearing and Order and Notice Scheduling Expedited Hearing Related [+] Service by Debtor's counsel. Entered on 7/16/2024. Hearing to be held on 7/18/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 103, Gainesville. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] (ggd)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6
8 8 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Tue 07/16 8:25 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 8/14/2024 at 11:00 AM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 866-643-3080 and enter participation code 1614372. (11 Gain) (ggd)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc P-Declaration of Debtor Tue 07/16 8:20 AM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtor filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Set Hearing, Motion to Tue 07/16 8:15 AM
Emergency Motion to Set Hearing on First Day Hearings filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Related [+] (Geer, Will)
Related: [-] 4 ,5
5 5 motion Joint Administration, Motion for Tue 07/16 8:11 AM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to Tue 07/16 8:10 AM
Emergency Motion to Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts filed by Will B. Geer on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
court Miscellaneous Deficiencies Tue 07/16 2:30 PM
Notice that the Motions Doc 4,5,6 filed by Will B. Geer is incorrect or deficient in the following manner: Missing Certificate of Service, Related [+] (ggd)
Related: [-] 4 ,5 ,6
Monday, July 15, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Mon 07/15 8:02 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/29/2024. Schedule(s) due by 7/29/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury due by 7/29/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 7/29/2024. Atty Disclosure State. due 7/29/2024. Corporate Resolution due 7/29/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 7/29/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 7/29/2024. (ggd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/15 7:12 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by David S. Weidenbaum on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Weidenbaum, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 07/14 12:44 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Filed by Will B. Geer of Rountree Leitman Klein & Geer LLC on behalf of James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/12/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 11/12/2024.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 08/13/2024 (Geer, Will)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Sun 07/14 12:44 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20848 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A61430965. Fee Amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1