Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-01277
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 14 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition Tue 04/22 9:47 AM
MEMORANDUM in opposition re13 Reply to response to petition filed by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Squire, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of appearance Mon 03/10 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas T. Squire on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Squire, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
14 14 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 4:09 PM
ORDER. Respondent shall file a surresponse within SIXTY DAYS of the date of this order addressing: a. Petitioner's equitable tolling argument; and b. The merits of Petitioner's claims set forth in the Amended Petition. Once filed, the Court will set a deadline for Petitioner to file a surreply by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 3/3/2025. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
13 13 respoth Reply to response to petition Tue 02/18 11:29 AM
REPLY re8 Response to habeas petition by Daniel Leija. (Tibbitt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/23 1:59 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Pamela J. Koller is terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/23/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Thu 01/23 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Rock McGuigan on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (McGuigan, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 01/23 10:03 AM
MOTION for Pamela J. Koller to Withdraw as Attorney by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Koller, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order directing response to motion Mon 11/18 1:25 PM
ORDER. Petitioner shall have NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order to file a Reply to the Response if he chooses. Thereafter, the Petition, the Response, and the Reply (if filed) will be taken under advisement by the Court, and an order will be entered without further notice. The Reply shall not exceed fifteen pages without leave of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 11/18/2024. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 answer Response to habeas petition Mon 11/04 3:57 PM
RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Koller, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibits A to V
Friday, August 09, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/09 11:38 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Secretary, Department of Corrections. (Koller, Pamela)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Fri 08/09 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Koller on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Koller, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 3 pgs order Order to respond to habeas petition Tue 08/06 1:25 PM
ORDER. Respondent shall file, within NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order, a response, entitled "Response to Amended Petition," indicating why the relief sought in the Petition should not be granted. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order, the Petition, and any supporting documentation to Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 8/6/2024.(TNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service Documents
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
4 4 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 07/16 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/15 1:45 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-1277-JSS-DCI. (TNP)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 07/15 9:31 AM
Amended PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Incorporated Memorandum of Law - state filed by Daniel Leija.(Tibbitt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Sat 07/13 11:13 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus with Incorporated Memorandum of Law - state (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number AFLMDC-22292440) filed by Daniel Leija.(Tibbitt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Appendix