Quaiden Fenstermaker et al v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-05910 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 1:22 AM PST |
Defendant
Chiquita Canyon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chiquita Canyon, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Waste Connections US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Quaiden Fenstermaker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alex Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederico Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grace Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kellyn Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosie Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kim Foster
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Frausto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farrah Frazer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lee Alexander Frazer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wynter Frazer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Storm Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josefina Galang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaileen Galdamez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adela Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angelica Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna J Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danali Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah M Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esther E Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guillermo Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ismael Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lacey Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonardo Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta H Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sara R Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Uriel Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashtin Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Avalin Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deanna Gardner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Garibay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremiah Gastinell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laim Gervais
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melbalee Ginn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Gist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Gist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Goertemiller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Agustin Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Rae Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corrine Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armando Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Violet Gonzales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Goodman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Antonio Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alyssa Hall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ava Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodie Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaden Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaxson Hanna
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Harrington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jill Harrington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristy Harrington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Falice Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bailey Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ginger Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paige Harrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Hartfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dakota Hatch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gielanie Hatch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Hatch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hechavarria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Heffern
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darcel Heim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilia Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Griselda Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Javier Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Santiago Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wally Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Savannah Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ludovic Hilde
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Hofmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith B Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Siane Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ace Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brooke Horton Gomez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Huerta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Hulin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Isaac Clemons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Lorena Izadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anahita Izadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Izadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Jacobsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Jacobsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lacie Jacobsen Dacey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Jade Piedra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diego Jaimez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Efrain Jaimez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gustavo Jaimez Tochihuitl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laila Janae Clemons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Jara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Jayden Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Jesus Barraza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iliana Jewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Jewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leo Jewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lily Jewell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Joanna Paredes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ernest Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Jose Elias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Joslyn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christy Kadharmestan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Kahn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Helen Keith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scot Keith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eunyoung Kih
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Kim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Kontogiannis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miriam Korn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Krecioch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beluse Lachin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Olga Lachin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamshir Lakdawala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pooja Lakdawala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samaya Lakdawala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Viaan Lakdawala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camryn Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Trudy Lamb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pat Langlois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Lauermann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lauermann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Lavadores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Lavadores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Lavadores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexa Leal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lee Clemons III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lee Clemons Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Lehman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Leiva
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hope Levasseur
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Lomaglio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Lomaglio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ursula Lomaglio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Lomeli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christian Lomeli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joesph Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph D Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur C Lopez Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur C Lopez Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrian Lorenzana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Loyola
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delaney Luh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Mahlstedt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Mahlstedt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Algeria Malig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enrique Manio Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Manly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Manly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Manly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Manly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Manrique
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosendo Manrique
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tirza Manrique
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carsten Manthey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Will Manville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camille Manzana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ferdinand Manzana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Rose Manzana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristine Marie Hirschfield
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corbin Marino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Marino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent Marino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adelina Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Faviola Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paola Mata
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley McCarty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Makenzie McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric McDonagh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura McDonagh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liam McDonagh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marianne McPherson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maureen Mcguigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Callie Mcintosh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Medrano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Veronica Medrano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grace Isabella Wilson Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Garcia-Puerto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maya Houfek-Langlois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Lachin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natividad Manio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heidi Marino
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 31, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Quaiden Fenstermaker. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kruger, Jackie) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES, GRANTING REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, CREATING CONSOLIDATED ACTION WITH NEW CAPTION, AND STAYING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS [ECF Nos. 75, 76, 77] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. For the reasons stated herein, the Court ORDERS as follows: The following actions shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes. The consolidated action shall be captioned: "In re Chiquita Canyon Landfill Litigation," with Case No. 2:23-cv- 08380. These cases are not consolidated for trial purposes, and each suit included in this consolidated action retains its separate identity. All of the actions listed above, items (a)(s)), shall be STAYED, and no further filings shall be made in those actions. Instead, filings should be made in the consolidated action, In re Chiquita Canyon Landfill Litigation. Every Pleading in the consolidated action shall bear the following caption. The file in the consolidated action (Case No. 2:23-cv-08380) shall constitute a Master File for every action in the consolidated action. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall promptly meet and confer regarding a process for guardian ad litem petitions. The parties are ORDERED to file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, a status update regarding their discussions on a process for guardian ad litem petitions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) Cases associated with Lead Case 2:23-cv-08380-MEMF-MAR (yl) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MINUTE ORDER OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (25) (39), (77) and DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (75) held before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Attorneys Rahda Rachana Pathak, Cherisse Cleofe, and Kristin Westphal are ORDERED to file Notices of Appearances by November 15, 2024. For the reasons stated on the record, the matter is taken under submission. Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Courtsmart. (yl) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice (Corrected) of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Related Matters filed by defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Does, Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc..(Chan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, October 30, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc.. Notice of Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Related Matters (Chan, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, having considered the Joint Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby ORDERS that Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to 30 days after entry of an order on the motion to dismiss the complaint in Howse, et al. v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC, et al., Case No. 2:23- cv-08380 MEMF-MAR. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 Days After Entry of Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Howse, et al. v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC, et al., Case No. 2:23-cv-08380 MEMF-MAR re Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc..(Chan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/06 6:19 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dbe) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges. Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-08380 MEMF(MARx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-05910 MEMF(MARx). Signed by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong (rn) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint9 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that Defendants' time to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint shall be extended to 30 days from the date of this order. (jp) |
|
10 | 10
![]() STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 30 Days After Entry of Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint in Howse, et al. v. Chiquita Canyon, LLC, et al., Case No. 2:23-cv-08380 MEMF-MAR re Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc..(Chan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Waste Connections US, Inc., re Notice of Related Case(s),3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties,,,4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party and to Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on July 15, 2024. (Chan, Paul) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc., identifying Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections US, Inc., Waste Connections, Inc., Great American E&S Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company, Beasley USA Services, Inc., Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Ascot Specialty Insurance Company, Admiral Insurance Company, Zurich Insurance Company of America, Chubb Insurance Company of Canada, AIG Insurance Company of Canada, Everest Insurance Company of Canada, Travelers Canada Specialty Insurance, Arch Insurance Canada Ltd., Axis Reinsurance Company, Continental Casualty Company (CNA), Swiss Re Corporate Solutions America Insurance Corp., National Liability and Fire Insurance Company, Berkeley Insurance Company Canada, Zurich Insurance Company Ltd.. (Chan, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-08380-MEMF-MAR, 2:24-cv-02444-MEMF-MAR, 2:24-CV-03531-MEMF-MAR, 2:24-cv-05679-SPG-MAR (Chan, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Chan, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV13731 Receipt No: ACACDC-37827710 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Waste Connections US, Inc.. (Attorney Paul S. Chan added to party Chiquita Canyon, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S. Chan added to party Chiquita Canyon, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Paul S. Chan added to party Waste Connections US, Inc.(pty:dft))(Chan, Paul) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 07/17 12:13 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Chiquita Canyon, Inc., Chiquita Canyon, LLC, Does, Waste Connections US, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Maria Joanna Paredes, Guillermo Garcia, Griselda Hernandez, Paola Mata, Efrain Jaimez, Steven Hamilton, Ace Holloway, Faviola Martinez, Farrah Frazer, Leo Jewell, Kim Foster, Ashtin Gardner, Charlie Rae Gomez, Richard Hechavarria, Anna J Garcia, Will Manville, Charles Lee Clemons Jr, Kristine Marie Hirschfield, Wally Hernandez, Julian Gomez, Wynter Frazer, Shirley Leiva, Marc Lamb, Emilia Hernandez, Daniel Loyola, Camryn Lamb, Esther E Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Kellyn Flores, Makenzie McCormick, Ginger Harrison, Julian Hernandez, Diana Hulin, Lisa Lavadores, Jonathan Jayden Guzman, Deborah M Garcia, Robert Marino, Joseph Martinez, Christopher Kontogiannis, Adelina Martinez, Lacie Jacobsen Dacey, David Gonzales, Liam McDonagh, Pat Langlois, Steven Flores, Mark Kim, Gielanie Hatch, Violet Gonzales, Siane Holland, Bruce Harrington, Darcel Heim, Falice Harris, Maria Gonzales, Alyssa Hall, Juan Martinez, Nicole Lomaglio, Vincent Marino, Miriam Korn, Ernest Johnson, Michael Frausto, Melanie Manrique, Ana Lorena Izadi, Jason Hatch, Viaan Lakdawala, Johnny Martinez, Ana Lomeli, Tara Manly, Scot Keith, Rosie Flores, Mohammad Izadi, Jodie Hamilton, Camille Manzana, Arthur C Lopez Jr, Pooja Lakdawala, Laim Gervais, Christine Mahlstedt, Jaileen Galdamez, Rosendo Manrique, Jeffrey Krecioch, Karen Jewell, Maya Houfek-Langlois, Nicole Joslyn, Enrique Manio Jr, Diana Jara, Paige Harrison, Maureen Mcguigan, Ashley Lauermann, Josefina Galang, Wendy Hernandez, Lily Jewell, Alexa Leal, Charles Lee Clemons III, Delaney Luh, Francisco Garibay, Gabriel Flores, Eric McDonagh, Ludovic Hilde, Veronica Medrano, Matthew Garcia, Diego Jaimez, Anthony Gardner, Corbin Marino, Alex Flores, Joesph Lopez, Ismael Garcia, Storm Freeman, Todd Goodman, Frederico Flores, Angelica Garcia, Dakota Hatch, Mary Rose Manzana, Gustavo Jaimez Tochihuitl, Natividad Manio, Christine Hofmann, Algeria Malig, Patricia Lehman, Jaxson Hanna, Jill Harrington, Benjamin Manly, Armando Gonzales, Grace Isabella Wilson Vasquez, Lisa Jacobsen, Jay Hernandez, Brooke Horton Gomez, George Martinez, Ivan Flores, Bill Jacobsen, Trudy Lamb, Carsten Manthey, Ashley McCarty, Beluse Lachin, Javier Hernandez, Ursula Lomaglio, Jeremiah Gastinell, Joseph Isaac Clemons, Carlos Hernandez, Adrian Lorenzana, Bailey Harrison, Marianne McPherson, Jeff Kahn, Jeff Lamb, Iliana Jewell, Melbalee Ginn, Samuel Garcia, Laura McDonagh, Jason Guzman, Savannah Herrera, Luis Flores, Uriel Garcia, Roy Gist, Arthur C Lopez Sr, Corrine Gomez, Avalin Gardner, Jose Antonio Guzman, Lee Alexander Frazer, Agustin Gomez, Kaden Hamilton, Tirza Manrique, Ava Hamilton, Scott Lomaglio, Eunyoung Kih, Elaine Hernandez, Alexis Jade Piedra, Jamshir Lakdawala, Andrew Lachin, Eduardo Garcia, Keith B Holland, Adela Garcia, Christina Johnson, Danali Garcia, Laila Janae Clemons, Juan Lavadores, Helen Keith, Sara R Garcia, Kristy Harrington, Debra Hartfield, Ferdinand Manzana, Larry Gonzales, Anthony Medrano, Brian Mahlstedt, Jeffrey Lamb, John Lauermann, Eric Jose Elias, Nicholas Goertemiller, Teresa Jesus Barraza, Olga Lachin, Maria Martinez, Zachary Lavadores, Theresa Garcia-Puerto, Howard Friedman, Deanna Gardner, Nathan Flores, Albert Huerta, Andrew Flores, Christian Heffern, William Manly, Marta H Garcia, Callie Mcintosh, Jacob Manly, Santiago Hernandez, Samaya Lakdawala, Robin Gist, Grace Flores, Anahita Izadi, Rebecca Garcia, Quaiden Fenstermaker, Lacey Garcia, Christian Lomeli, Hope Levasseur, Christy Kadharmestan, Heidi Marino, Joseph D Lopez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/29/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 07/17 12:18 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Maria Joanna Paredes, Guillermo Garcia, Griselda Hernandez, Paola Mata, Efrain Jaimez, Steven Hamilton, Ace Holloway, Faviola Martinez, Farrah Frazer, Leo Jewell, Kim Foster, Ashtin Gardner, Charlie Rae Gomez, Richard Hechavarria, Anna J Garcia, Will Manville, Charles Lee Clemons Jr, Kristine Marie Hirschfield, Wally Hernandez, Julian Gomez, Wynter Frazer, Shirley Leiva, Marc Lamb, Emilia Hernandez, Daniel Loyola, Camryn Lamb, Esther E Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Kellyn Flores, Makenzie McCormick, Ginger Harrison, Julian Hernandez, Diana Hulin, Lisa Lavadores, Jonathan Jayden Guzman, Deborah M Garcia, Robert Marino, Joseph Martinez, Christopher Kontogiannis, Adelina Martinez, Lacie Jacobsen Dacey, David Gonzales, Liam McDonagh, Pat Langlois, Steven Flores, Mark Kim, Gielanie Hatch, Violet Gonzales, Siane Holland, Bruce Harrington, Darcel Heim, Falice Harris, Maria Gonzales, Alyssa Hall, Juan Martinez, Nicole Lomaglio, Vincent Marino, Miriam Korn, Ernest Johnson, Michael Frausto, Melanie Manrique, Ana Lorena Izadi, Jason Hatch, Viaan Lakdawala, Johnny Martinez, Ana Lomeli, Tara Manly, Scot Keith, Rosie Flores, Mohammad Izadi, Jodie Hamilton, Camille Manzana, Arthur C Lopez Jr, Pooja Lakdawala, Laim Gervais, Christine Mahlstedt, Jaileen Galdamez, Rosendo Manrique, Jeffrey Krecioch, Karen Jewell, Maya Houfek-Langlois, Nicole Joslyn, Enrique Manio Jr, Diana Jara, Paige Harrison, Maureen Mcguigan, Ashley Lauermann, Josefina Galang, Wendy Hernandez, Lily Jewell, Alexa Leal, Charles Lee Clemons III, Delaney Luh, Francisco Garibay, Gabriel Flores, Eric McDonagh, Ludovic Hilde, Veronica Medrano, Matthew Garcia, Diego Jaimez, Anthony Gardner, Corbin Marino, Alex Flores, Joesph Lopez, Ismael Garcia, Storm Freeman, Todd Goodman, Frederico Flores, Angelica Garcia, Dakota Hatch, Mary Rose Manzana, Gustavo Jaimez Tochihuitl, Natividad Manio, Christine Hofmann, Algeria Malig, Patricia Lehman, Jaxson Hanna, Jill Harrington, Benjamin Manly, Armando Gonzales, Grace Isabella Wilson Vasquez, Lisa Jacobsen, Jay Hernandez, Brooke Horton Gomez, George Martinez, Ivan Flores, Bill Jacobsen, Trudy Lamb, Carsten Manthey, Ashley McCarty, Beluse Lachin, Javier Hernandez, Ursula Lomaglio, Jeremiah Gastinell, Joseph Isaac Clemons, Carlos Hernandez, Adrian Lorenzana, Bailey Harrison, Marianne McPherson, Jeff Kahn, Jeff Lamb, Iliana Jewell, Melbalee Ginn, Samuel Garcia, Laura McDonagh, Jason Guzman, Savannah Herrera, Luis Flores, Uriel Garcia, Roy Gist, Arthur C Lopez Sr, Corrine Gomez, Avalin Gardner, Jose Antonio Guzman, Lee Alexander Frazer, Agustin Gomez, Kaden Hamilton, Tirza Manrique, Ava Hamilton, Scott Lomaglio, Eunyoung Kih, Elaine Hernandez, Alexis Jade Piedra, Jamshir Lakdawala, Andrew Lachin, Eduardo Garcia, Keith B Holland, Adela Garcia, Christina Johnson, Danali Garcia, Laila Janae Clemons, Juan Lavadores, Helen Keith, Sara R Garcia, Kristy Harrington, Debra Hartfield, Ferdinand Manzana, Larry Gonzales, Anthony Medrano, Brian Mahlstedt, Jeffrey Lamb, John Lauermann, Eric Jose Elias, Nicholas Goertemiller, Teresa Jesus Barraza, Olga Lachin, Maria Martinez, Zachary Lavadores, Theresa Garcia-Puerto, Howard Friedman, Deanna Gardner, Nathan Flores, Albert Huerta, Andrew Flores, Christian Heffern, William Manly, Marta H Garcia, Callie Mcintosh, Jacob Manly, Santiago Hernandez, Samaya Lakdawala, Robin Gist, Grace Flores, Anahita Izadi, Rebecca Garcia, Quaiden Fenstermaker, Lacey Garcia, Christian Lomeli, Hope Levasseur, Christy Kadharmestan, Heidi Marino, Joseph D Lopez, upon Defendant Chiquita Canyon, Inc. served on 6/13/2024, answer due 7/5/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Agent Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/17/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 07/17 12:22 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Maria Joanna Paredes, Guillermo Garcia, Griselda Hernandez, Paola Mata, Efrain Jaimez, Steven Hamilton, Ace Holloway, Faviola Martinez, Farrah Frazer, Leo Jewell, Kim Foster, Ashtin Gardner, Charlie Rae Gomez, Richard Hechavarria, Anna J Garcia, Will Manville, Charles Lee Clemons Jr, Kristine Marie Hirschfield, Wally Hernandez, Julian Gomez, Wynter Frazer, Shirley Leiva, Marc Lamb, Emilia Hernandez, Daniel Loyola, Camryn Lamb, Esther E Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Kellyn Flores, Makenzie McCormick, Ginger Harrison, Julian Hernandez, Diana Hulin, Lisa Lavadores, Jonathan Jayden Guzman, Deborah M Garcia, Robert Marino, Joseph Martinez, Christopher Kontogiannis, Adelina Martinez, Lacie Jacobsen Dacey, David Gonzales, Liam McDonagh, Pat Langlois, Steven Flores, Mark Kim, Gielanie Hatch, Violet Gonzales, Siane Holland, Bruce Harrington, Darcel Heim, Falice Harris, Maria Gonzales, Alyssa Hall, Juan Martinez, Nicole Lomaglio, Vincent Marino, Miriam Korn, Ernest Johnson, Michael Frausto, Melanie Manrique, Ana Lorena Izadi, Jason Hatch, Viaan Lakdawala, Johnny Martinez, Ana Lomeli, Tara Manly, Scot Keith, Rosie Flores, Mohammad Izadi, Jodie Hamilton, Camille Manzana, Arthur C Lopez Jr, Pooja Lakdawala, Laim Gervais, Christine Mahlstedt, Jaileen Galdamez, Rosendo Manrique, Jeffrey Krecioch, Karen Jewell, Maya Houfek-Langlois, Nicole Joslyn, Enrique Manio Jr, Diana Jara, Paige Harrison, Maureen Mcguigan, Ashley Lauermann, Josefina Galang, Wendy Hernandez, Lily Jewell, Alexa Leal, Charles Lee Clemons III, Delaney Luh, Francisco Garibay, Gabriel Flores, Eric McDonagh, Ludovic Hilde, Veronica Medrano, Matthew Garcia, Diego Jaimez, Anthony Gardner, Corbin Marino, Alex Flores, Joesph Lopez, Ismael Garcia, Storm Freeman, Todd Goodman, Frederico Flores, Angelica Garcia, Dakota Hatch, Mary Rose Manzana, Gustavo Jaimez Tochihuitl, Natividad Manio, Christine Hofmann, Algeria Malig, Patricia Lehman, Jaxson Hanna, Jill Harrington, Benjamin Manly, Armando Gonzales, Grace Isabella Wilson Vasquez, Lisa Jacobsen, Jay Hernandez, Brooke Horton Gomez, George Martinez, Ivan Flores, Bill Jacobsen, Trudy Lamb, Carsten Manthey, Ashley McCarty, Beluse Lachin, Javier Hernandez, Ursula Lomaglio, Jeremiah Gastinell, Joseph Isaac Clemons, Carlos Hernandez, Adrian Lorenzana, Bailey Harrison, Marianne McPherson, Jeff Kahn, Jeff Lamb, Iliana Jewell, Melbalee Ginn, Samuel Garcia, Laura McDonagh, Jason Guzman, Savannah Herrera, Luis Flores, Uriel Garcia, Roy Gist, Arthur C Lopez Sr, Corrine Gomez, Avalin Gardner, Jose Antonio Guzman, Lee Alexander Frazer, Agustin Gomez, Kaden Hamilton, Tirza Manrique, Ava Hamilton, Scott Lomaglio, Eunyoung Kih, Elaine Hernandez, Alexis Jade Piedra, Jamshir Lakdawala, Andrew Lachin, Eduardo Garcia, Keith B Holland, Adela Garcia, Christina Johnson, Danali Garcia, Laila Janae Clemons, Juan Lavadores, Helen Keith, Sara R Garcia, Kristy Harrington, Debra Hartfield, Ferdinand Manzana, Larry Gonzales, Anthony Medrano, Brian Mahlstedt, Jeffrey Lamb, John Lauermann, Eric Jose Elias, Nicholas Goertemiller, Teresa Jesus Barraza, Olga Lachin, Maria Martinez, Zachary Lavadores, Theresa Garcia-Puerto, Howard Friedman, Deanna Gardner, Nathan Flores, Albert Huerta, Andrew Flores, Christian Heffern, William Manly, Marta H Garcia, Callie Mcintosh, Jacob Manly, Santiago Hernandez, Samaya Lakdawala, Robin Gist, Grace Flores, Anahita Izadi, Rebecca Garcia, Quaiden Fenstermaker, Lacey Garcia, Christian Lomeli, Hope Levasseur, Christy Kadharmestan, Heidi Marino, Joseph D Lopez, upon Defendant Chiquita Canyon, LLC served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Crystal Collins, Agent Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/18/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 07/17 12:25 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Maria Joanna Paredes, Guillermo Garcia, Griselda Hernandez, Paola Mata, Efrain Jaimez, Steven Hamilton, Ace Holloway, Faviola Martinez, Farrah Frazer, Leo Jewell, Kim Foster, Ashtin Gardner, Charlie Rae Gomez, Richard Hechavarria, Anna J Garcia, Will Manville, Charles Lee Clemons Jr, Kristine Marie Hirschfield, Wally Hernandez, Julian Gomez, Wynter Frazer, Shirley Leiva, Marc Lamb, Emilia Hernandez, Daniel Loyola, Camryn Lamb, Esther E Garcia, Leonardo Garcia, Kellyn Flores, Makenzie McCormick, Ginger Harrison, Julian Hernandez, Diana Hulin, Lisa Lavadores, Jonathan Jayden Guzman, Deborah M Garcia, Robert Marino, Joseph Martinez, Christopher Kontogiannis, Adelina Martinez, Lacie Jacobsen Dacey, David Gonzales, Liam McDonagh, Pat Langlois, Steven Flores, Mark Kim, Gielanie Hatch, Violet Gonzales, Siane Holland, Bruce Harrington, Darcel Heim, Falice Harris, Maria Gonzales, Alyssa Hall, Juan Martinez, Nicole Lomaglio, Vincent Marino, Miriam Korn, Ernest Johnson, Michael Frausto, Melanie Manrique, Ana Lorena Izadi, Jason Hatch, Viaan Lakdawala, Johnny Martinez, Ana Lomeli, Tara Manly, Scot Keith, Rosie Flores, Mohammad Izadi, Jodie Hamilton, Camille Manzana, Arthur C Lopez Jr, Pooja Lakdawala, Laim Gervais, Christine Mahlstedt, Jaileen Galdamez, Rosendo Manrique, Jeffrey Krecioch, Karen Jewell, Maya Houfek-Langlois, Nicole Joslyn, Enrique Manio Jr, Diana Jara, Paige Harrison, Maureen Mcguigan, Ashley Lauermann, Josefina Galang, Wendy Hernandez, Lily Jewell, Alexa Leal, Charles Lee Clemons III, Delaney Luh, Francisco Garibay, Gabriel Flores, Eric McDonagh, Ludovic Hilde, Veronica Medrano, Matthew Garcia, Diego Jaimez, Anthony Gardner, Corbin Marino, Alex Flores, Joesph Lopez, Ismael Garcia, Storm Freeman, Todd Goodman, Frederico Flores, Angelica Garcia, Dakota Hatch, Mary Rose Manzana, Gustavo Jaimez Tochihuitl, Natividad Manio, Christine Hofmann, Algeria Malig, Patricia Lehman, Jaxson Hanna, Jill Harrington, Benjamin Manly, Armando Gonzales, Grace Isabella Wilson Vasquez, Lisa Jacobsen, Jay Hernandez, Brooke Horton Gomez, George Martinez, Ivan Flores, Bill Jacobsen, Trudy Lamb, Carsten Manthey, Ashley McCarty, Beluse Lachin, Javier Hernandez, Ursula Lomaglio, Jeremiah Gastinell, Joseph Isaac Clemons, Carlos Hernandez, Adrian Lorenzana, Bailey Harrison, Marianne McPherson, Jeff Kahn, Jeff Lamb, Iliana Jewell, Melbalee Ginn, Samuel Garcia, Laura McDonagh, Jason Guzman, Savannah Herrera, Luis Flores, Uriel Garcia, Roy Gist, Arthur C Lopez Sr, Corrine Gomez, Avalin Gardner, Jose Antonio Guzman, Lee Alexander Frazer, Agustin Gomez, Kaden Hamilton, Tirza Manrique, Ava Hamilton, Scott Lomaglio, Eunyoung Kih, Elaine Hernandez, Alexis Jade Piedra, Jamshir Lakdawala, Andrew Lachin, Eduardo Garcia, Keith B Holland, Adela Garcia, Christina Johnson, Danali Garcia, Laila Janae Clemons, Juan Lavadores, Helen Keith, Sara R Garcia, Kristy Harrington, Debra Hartfield, Ferdinand Manzana, Larry Gonzales, Anthony Medrano, Brian Mahlstedt, Jeffrey Lamb, John Lauermann, Eric Jose Elias, Nicholas Goertemiller, Teresa Jesus Barraza, Olga Lachin, Maria Martinez, Zachary Lavadores, Theresa Garcia-Puerto, Howard Friedman, Deanna Gardner, Nathan Flores, Albert Huerta, Andrew Flores, Christian Heffern, William Manly, Marta H Garcia, Callie Mcintosh, Jacob Manly, Santiago Hernandez, Samaya Lakdawala, Robin Gist, Grace Flores, Anahita Izadi, Rebecca Garcia, Quaiden Fenstermaker, Lacey Garcia, Christian Lomeli, Hope Levasseur, Christy Kadharmestan, Heidi Marino, Joseph D Lopez, upon Defendant Waste Connections US, Inc. served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Crystal Collins, Agent Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/18/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |