New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:24-cv-05323
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Case in other court:New York Eastern, 1:24-cv-03885
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:37 AM EST
Defendant
Universal City Studios LLC
Represented By
Jason Douglas Jones
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
David Donahue
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Kimberly Frumkin
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Universal Music Group N.V.
Represented By
Jason Douglas Jones
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
David Donahue
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Kimberly Frumkin
Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Adrian Torres
1322 Bedford Ave.
Brooklyn, NY 11216


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
91 91 misc Letter Fri 05/02 10:38 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from David Donahue dated May 2, 2025 re: Recent Submissions by Plaintiff. Document filed by Universal City Studios LLC, Universal Music Group N.V...(Donahue, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
90 90 misc Letter Thu 05/01 1:25 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from John Adrian Torres dated 5/1/2025 re: I write today to express something Ive carried with me since our last in-person conference. Document filed by John Adrian Torres. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
89 89 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/30 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY AND EQUITABLE RIGHT TO COMPENSATION. Document filed by John Adrian Torres. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
88 88 misc Remark Tue 04/29 11:19 AM
PLAINTIFF'S FINAL STATEMENT PART II: A RECORD OF FRAUD, FORGOTTEN PROMISES, AND THE RIGHT TO EQUITY. Document filed by John Adrian Torres. (jjc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 04/29 11:27 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 89 Motion to amend. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jjc)
Related: [-]