North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 5:24-cv-00409
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Terminated:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
Unlocking Home Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff
Masterkey Property Management, LLC
Represented By
Tara D. Warwick
Carneswarwick
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/23 4:58 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Masterkey Property Management, LLC as to Unlocking Home Solutions, LLC. (Warwick, Tara)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/13 11:32 AM
TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on plaintiff's failure to proceed after the court's notice of failure to make service within 90 days DE 5 . Plaintiff is DIRECTED to show cause within 14 days of this order as to why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. In the event plaintiff fails to respond to the instant order within the time specified, the clerk shall close the case for failure to prosecute without further order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/13/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days Thu 11/07 11:11 AM
Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service Within 90 Days as to Defendant Unlocking Home Solutions, LLC. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
4 4 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 10/29 10:30 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Masterkey Property Management, LLC (Warwick, Tara)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/29 10:28 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Tara D. Warwick on behalf of Masterkey Property Management, LLC. (Warwick, Tara)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 10/28 3:19 PM
SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. The financial disclosure statement and notice of appearance are stand alone documents that should be filed using the events labeled as such on the docket. Counsel shall refile. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/15 5:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Unlocking Home Solutions, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/15 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Unlocking Home Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7689595.), filed by Masterkey Property Management, LLC. (Warwick, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Reg No. 5750420,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Reg No. 6731177,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Infringing Marks,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Unlocking Home Solutions LLC,
Att: 6 Supplement Financial Disclosure MasterKey Property Management LLC,
Att: 7 Supplement Notice Of Appearance Tara Warwick
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 07/15 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Complaint. The financial disclosure statement and notice of appearance are stand alone documents that should be filed using the events labeled as such on the docket. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 07/15 5:25 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:1 Complaint. The attorney information in the signature block does not match the information the court has in its CM/ECFdatabase. Counsel is directed to update contact information in CM/ECF by choosing "Utilities" and selecting "Maintain Your Account." Contact the clerk's office if additional assistance is required. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]