MEGHJI v. BENARTZI et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:24-ap-03992 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
GUY BENARTZI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELENE CHKEIDZE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LEVAN MKHEIDZE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JASON STONE
99 JOHN STREET #1405
NEW YORK, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
KEYFI INC.
99 JOHN STREET #1405
NEW YORK, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI, LITIGATION ADMNISTRATOR, AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE POST-EFFECTIVE DATE DEBTORS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Stipulated Confidentiality Order Signed on 2/4/2025. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Proposed Order / Stipulated Confidentiality Order filed by Mitchell Hurley on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hurley, Mitchell) |
|
Monday, December 30, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Acosta, Annya) |
|
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Letter to the Clerk of the Court Requesting Service Abroad for Defendant Guy Benartzi Filed by Mitchell Hurley on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hurley, Mitchell) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order, Signed on 10/2/2024, Permitting Expedited Discovery. (Anderson, Deanna) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Letter Regarding Discovery Filed by Mitchell Hurley on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI.(Hurley, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Adversary Complaint Filed by Mitchell Hurley on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hurley, Mitchell) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Foreign Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against GUY BENARTZI.; ELENE CHKEIDZE.; KEYFI INC.; LEVAN MKHEIDZ.; JASON STONE. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Nicholas Robert Lombardi on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Lombardi, Nicholas) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Elizabeth Scott on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Scott, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Dean Lindsay Chapman Jr. on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Chapman, Dean) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 07/15 5:49 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-03992 mg] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16713614. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-03992 Complaint against GUY BENARTZI, ELENE CHKEIDZE, LEVAN MKHEIDZE, JASON STONE, KEYFI INC. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Mitchell Hurley on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hurley, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |