Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:24-cv-11802
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
City Side Enterprises, Inc.
6 Roland Street
Charlestown, MA 02129
Represented By
Jordan J. Rodrigues
Rodrigues Law Group LLC
contact info
Albert P. Marks
Rodrigues Law Group, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Colleen Ogilvie
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Meredith G. Fierro
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
City of Boston
Represented By
Elizabeth Teebagy
City Of Boston
contact info
Defendant
Norwood Gulf, Inc.
Defendant
Precision Auto Body and Towing, Inc.
Plaintiff
Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin J. Kiely
Kiely & Ferrante, LLC
contact info
Nicholas A. Duston
Norris Mclaughlin , PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/13 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
38 38 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 12:42 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. The Court ADOPTS the parties' proposed37 scheduling order and sets the following deadlines: SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES : Amendments to pleadings due by June 20, 2025 All discovery, other than expert discovery, due by November 17, 2025 Plaintiff's trial experts must be designated, and the information contemplated by Fed.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) must be disclosed, by December 15, 2025 Plaintiff's trial experts must be deposed by January 16, 2026 Defendant's trial experts must be designated, and the information contemplated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) must be disclosed, by January 30, 2026 Defendant's trial experts must be deposed by February 27, 2026 Dispositive motions, such as motions for summary judgment and motions for judgment on the pleadings, must be filed by April 16, 2026 Oppositions to dispositive motions must be filed within 21 days after service of the motion Reply memoranda, not to exceed 10 pages, must be filed within 14 days after service of the opposition papers. For all other deadlines, please refer to Dkt. 37. NOTICE OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference previously set for 3/11/2025 is CANCELLED. Status Conference set for 11/18/2025 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley.(MAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
37 37 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Wed 03/05 8:49 AM
Proposed JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
36 36 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 02/18 1:00 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING IN PART 35 Joint Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference for 45 days. Counsel shall file a proposed scheduling order no later than March 4, 2025. Scheduling Conference rescheduled to 3/11/2025 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley. (MAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
35 35 motion Continue Mon 02/17 1:10 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
34 34 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Precision Auto Body and Towing, Inc. served on 2/3/2025, answer due 2/24/2025. (Duston, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
33 33 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 1:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Norwood Gulf, Inc. served on 1/31/2025, answer due 2/21/2025. (Duston, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 5:24 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by Colleen Ogilvie.(Fierro, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/16 3:37 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by City Side Enterprises, Inc..(Rodrigues, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
30 30 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 1:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Norwood Gulf, Inc., Precision Auto Body and Towing, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/03 11:02 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City Side Enterprises, Inc., City of Boston, Colleen Ogilvie, Precision Auto Body and Towing, Inc., Norwood Gulf, Inc., filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Duston, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 12/31 3:23 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 27 Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
27 27 motion Amend Mon 12/30 11:36 AM
Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 amended complaint,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, December 13, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 12/13 7:35 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 23 Motion to Continue. Scheduling Conference rescheduled to 2/19/2025 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8 Related [+] before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-] mote only
25 25 order Order on Motion to Amend Fri 12/13 7:33 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re24 Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint. The motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE , subject to a renewed filing consistent with the following. District of Massachusetts Local Rule 15.1(b) requires that "[a] party moving to amend a pleading to add a new party shall serve, in the manner contemplated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b), the motion to amend upon the proposed new party at least 14 days in advance of filing the motion, together with a separate document stating the date on which the motion will be filed. A motion to amend a pleading to add a new party shall be accompanied by a certificate stating that it has been served in advance on the new party as required by this rule." The Court will provide plaintiff with twenty-one (21) days to serve the Proposed Amended Complaint on plaintiff's newly presented defendants, Precision Auto Body and Towing, Inc. and Norwood Gulf, Inc., and to refile the motion. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
24 24 motion Amend Thu 12/12 3:45 PM
Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 amended complaint
23 23 motion Continue Thu 12/12 11:02 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Case Scheduling Conference to 02/18/2025 by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 10/22 12:11 PM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 21 Joint Motion to Continue. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order no later than December 11, 2024. Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2024 12:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Continue Tue 10/22 12:00 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to 11/30/2024 by Santander Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert P. Marks on behalf of City Side Enterprises, Inc. (Marks, Albert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Tue 10/08 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: The parties are directed to consult and submit an agreed-upon pretrial schedule, as per the attached sample, no later than 7 days before the Scheduling Conference. If the Court finds parties' proposed deadlines reasonable or requires only minor adjustments, it may enter a scheduling order in lieu of holding the scheduling conference. Otherwise, Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. Should the parties wish to appear by video conference and all parties assent to such change, they may reach out to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to modify the hearing no later than two business days prior to the scheduled hearing. (Lara, Miguel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 11:03 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Colleen Ogilvie.(Fierro, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/04 12:51 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City of Boston.(Teebagy, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 8:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City Side Enterprises, Inc..(Rodrigues, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/16 10:43 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 29, 2024 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. City Side Enterprises, Inc., City of Boston, and Colleen Ogilvie answer due 8/29/2024. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/15 1:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to August 29, 2024 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by City Side Enterprises, Inc..(Rodrigues, Jordan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/15 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan J. Rodrigues on behalf of City Side Enterprises, Inc. (Rodrigues, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/13 10:50 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith G. Fierro on behalf of Colleen Ogilvie (Fierro, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/01 3:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. City Side Enterprises, Inc. served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/01 3:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. City of Boston served on 7/25/2024, answer due 8/15/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/01 3:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. Colleen Ogilvie served on 7/22/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. Acknowledgement filed by Santander Consumer USA, Inc.. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 07/16 10:20 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nicholas A. Duston. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account] . (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Payment of Fees Tue 07/16 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY PAYMENT OF FEES by Plaintiff Santandar Consumer USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10508355. Payment Type : PRO HAC VICE. (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/16 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to City Side Enterprises, Inc., City of Boston, Colleen Ogilvie. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/16/2024) (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 07/16 8:55 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/15 2:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nicholas A. Duston by Santandar Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin) (Kelly, Danielle). (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/15/2024) (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order
Att: 2 (7/15/2024) Certification of Nicholas A. Duston
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/15 2:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Santandar Consumer USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Santandar Consumer USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Santandar Consumer USA Holdings, Inc. for Santandar Consumer USA, Inc... (Kiely, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/15 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10507037 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Santandar Consumer USA, Inc..(Kiely, Kevin) Modified on 7/15/2024: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form