Soul Quest Church of Mother Earth Inc
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lori V Vaughan |
Case #: | 6:24-bk-03612 |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Dismissed: | Jul 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Soul Quest Church of Mother Earth Inc
1371 Hancock Lone Palm Rd
Orlando, FL 32828-7207 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - ORL
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 10/31 12:17 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Adrienne) |
||
Thursday, October 24, 2024 | ||
court
(NO PAPER) - Removal of Restrictions on Transcript
Thu 10/24 4:43 PM
Removal of Viewing Restrictions on Transcript Due to No Request for Redaction from Hearing Participants . (Vivianne) |