Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:William I Arbuckle
Case #: 1:24-cv-01166
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
Eddie Bauer, L.L.C.
Represented By
Kelly A. Quinn
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael T. Paul
64 Gettysburg Street P.O. Box 182
Arendtsville, PA 17303


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/14 1:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Michael T. Paul. (nr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (60 Day Settlement Order) Wed 01/15 3:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mark this matter CLOSED for administrative purposes only. The parties are DIRECTED to file an appropriate stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), which specifies whether the dismissal will be with or without prejudice; Either party may file a notice to reinstate this action if the settlement is not consummated within sixty days of this order, provided that such notice is filed no later than 3/17/2025; and If the parties fail to timely file a stipulation of dismissal or notice to reinstate this action within the sixty days, this order shall operate as a voluntary dismissal with prejudice, based on the parties' aforementioned notice of settlement. See Papera v. Pa. Quarried Bluestone Co., 948 F.3d 607, 61012 (3d Cir. 2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 1/15/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Letter Wed 01/15 11:04 AM
Letter from Kelly A. Quinn Request that the Court enter a 60-day Settlement Order . (Quinn, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/23 3:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Eddie Bauer, L.L.C..(Quinn, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 misc Consent Form Sent (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) Mon 12/09 11:27 AM
CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Scranton Operations Supervisor, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 1/8/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/09 11:24 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) The parties' Stipulation12 is APPROVED. Defendant's deadline to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is now due on or before 12/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 12/9/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 12/06 5:31 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Eddie Bauer, L.L.C., filed by Eddie Bauer, L.L.C..(Quinn, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/25 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal Service. Eddie Bauer, L.L.C. served on 11/18/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. (Proof of service also attached) (nr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 3:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Eddie Bauer, L.L.C. and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (nr)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order Directing USM to Serve Summons and Complaint Thu 10/17 3:14 PM
ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that The Clerk of Court is directed to issue Summons, a copy of theComplaint (Doc. 1), and this Order to the U.S. Marshal Service for immediate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) on the named Defendant located at 2200 1st Avenue South, Suite 400, Seattle, Washington, 98134. (See Order for full/complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 10/17/2024. (nr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
8 8 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Tue 10/15 12:53 PM
RESPONSE by Michael T. Paul to7 Order, providing Eddie Bauer L.L.C address. (nr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 09/23 2:07 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: (1.) Plaintiff will file with the Court a document indicating the correct address for Defendant Eddie Bauer, L.L.C. on or before 10/23/2024. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against these Defendants pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/23/2024. (caw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Thu 09/05 8:45 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Marshal Services as to Eddie Bauer, L.L.C. (nr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Directing USM to Serve Summons and Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/30 10:38 AM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Clerk of Court is directed to issue Summons, a copy of the Complaint (Doc.1), notice of lawsuit and request to waive service of summons (form AO 398), waiver of the service of summons (form AO 399) and this Order to the U.S. Marshal Service for immediate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3) on the named Defendant. (See Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/30/2024. (nr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 misc Pro Se Letter issued - MJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 07/15 4:44 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Excerpts of Local and Federal Rules
3 3 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Mon 07/15 4:43 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ea)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/15 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael T. Paul. (ea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/15 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Eddie Bauer, L.L.C. lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Michael T. Paul. (ea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Various Email Correspondences regarding Employment