Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Rachel Ralston Mancl
Case #: 2:24-bk-50714
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Dismissed:May 01, 2025

Debtor
Juhn and Stark, PLLC
2333 Knob Creek Rd Ste 12
Johnson City, TN 37604-2007
Represented By
Juhn and Stark, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
David Juhn
1185 West Mountain View Road Apt. 1121
Johnson City, TN 37604
Represented By
Mark L. Esposito
Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 12:02 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
208 208 motion Compensation Tue 05/13 9:14 AM
Final Application for Compensation for Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC, Attorney, Period: 2/1/2025 to 5/12/2025, Fee: $13,926.25, Expenses: $597.10. Filed by Attorney Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC Objections to applications for compensation due by 6/3/2025. (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
207 207 misc Withdraw Document(s) Mon 05/12 4:51 PM
Withdraw Documents(s) Filed by Maurice K. Guinn on behalf of Attorney Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC Related [+]. (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-] 206 Application for Compensation
206 206 motion Compensation Mon 05/12 3:51 PM
Application for Compensation for Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC, Attorney, Period: 2/1/2025 to 5/12/2025, Fee: $13,926.25, Expenses: $597.10. Filed by Attorney Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC Objections to applications for compensation due by 6/2/2025. (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
205 205 misc Withdraw Document(s) Mon 05/12 3:47 PM
Withdraw Documents(s) Filed by Maurice K. Guinn on behalf of Attorney Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC Related [+]. (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-] 204 Application for Compensation
204 204 motion Compensation Mon 05/12 3:41 PM
Final Application for Compensation for Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC, Attorney, Period: 2/1/2025 to 5/12/2025, Fee: $13,926.25, Expenses: $597.10. Filed by Attorney Gentry Tipton & McLemore, PC Objections to applications for compensation due by 6/2/2025. (Guinn, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
203 203 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Thu 05/08 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 19. Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 202 Order Granting Application For Compensation (Related Doc190 ) for Brenda G. Brooks, fees awarded: $4,470.00, expenses awarded: $50.00. (mpw)