Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:R Barclay Surrick
Case #: 2:24-cv-03051
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS
Represented By
DAVID SMITH
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CHRIS MORTON
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ASST DIST ATTY MICHAEL GARISMA
Represented By
DAVID SMITH
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Defendant
SHERIFF ROCHELLE BILAL
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER
Represented By
DAVID SMITH
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON
Represented By
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS
Represented By
David Connor Warner
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By
DANIELLE E. WALSH
City Of Phila Law Dept
contact info
Defendant
ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP
Represented By
DAVID SMITH
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DERRICK JACOBS
P.O. BOX 1454
BERLIN, MD 21811
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CRAIG MORTON
Terminated: 12/12/2024
Represented By
JOHN P. GONZALES
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman And Goggin, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
35 35 respoth Response Tue 02/25 4:41 PM
Response by Pro Se Plaintiff DERRICK JACOBS to Reply Memorandum of Defendants Lawrence Krasner, Patricia Cummings, Tracy Tripp and Michael Garmisa in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6), Certificate of Service. (DT) (dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Cover Page
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 02/11 6:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Certificate of Service filed by ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, MICHAEL GARISMA, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER. (SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 3:30 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III TO DISTRICT JUDGE R. BARCLAY SURRICK FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/5/25. 2/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
32 32 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/04 2:00 PM
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) filed by DERRICK JACOBS.(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Cover page
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
31 31 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/21 4:50 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, MICHAEL GARISMA.Certificate of Service.(SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER CHARLES NANA-SINKAM on behalf of ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, MICHAEL GARISMA with Certificate of Service(NANA-SINKAM, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE E. KANE on behalf of ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, MICHAEL GARISMA with Certificate of Service(KANE, ANNE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
28 28 respoth Response Mon 01/06 2:21 PM
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINITFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) by DERRICK JACOBS. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 COVER PAGE
Monday, December 23, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Mon 12/23 3:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CHRIS MORTON, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, ROCHELLE BILAL, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 19, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/19 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Connor Warner on behalf of PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CHRIS MORTON, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY with Certificate of Service(Warner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 12, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 1:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Connor Warner on behalf of DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, ROCHELLE BILAL, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG with Certificate of Service(Warner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
24 24 service Summons Issued Thu 12/12 11:10 AM
Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CHRIS MORTON. Forwarded To: PRO SE PLAINTIFF on 12/12/24 (mas)
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/12 11:04 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, ROCHELLE BILAL, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, MICHAEL GARISMA, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG, PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CHRIS MORTON, filed by DERRICK JACOBS.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 cover page
Friday, December 06, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/06 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GONZALES on behalf of PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, ROCHELLE BILAL, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CRAIG MORTON, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(GONZALES, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/05 3:02 PM
ORDER THAT COURTS ORDER DATED 12/3/24 (DOC. 17) IS VACATED. AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 12/19/2024 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/5/24. 12/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Thu 12/05 2:59 PM
EMAIL LETTER TO THE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III FROM DERRICK JACOBS (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
19 19 service Summons Issued Wed 12/04 4:16 PM
Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CRAIG MORTON. Forwarded To: Derrick Jacobs on 12/4/24 (fdc)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons Wed 12/04 10:59 AM
Praecipe to Issue Alias Summons filed by DERRICK JACOBS. Certificate of Service.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 12/03 3:26 PM
ORDER THAT THE COURT'S ORDER DATED 11/5/2411 IS VACATED. THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CHRIS MORTON UNLESS PLAINTIFF SERVES HIM ON OR BEFORE 12/20/24; AND PLAINTIFF'S "MOTION FOR PRAECIPE TO ISSUE AN ALIAS SUMMONS"13 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/3/24.12/3/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Wed 11/27 2:05 PM
Letter to the Court dated 11/27/24 by DERRICK JACOBS(er)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover page
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, MICHAEL GARISMA, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS. ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; MICHAEL GARISMA waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025; ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/25 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, ROCHELLE BILAL, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH. PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; ROCHELLE BILAL waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; CITY OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025; DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 waiver,
Att: 2 waiver,
Att: 3 waiver,
Att: 4 waiver,
Att: 5 waiver,
Att: 6 waiver,
Att: 7 waiver,
Att: 8 waiver,
Att: 9 waiver,
Att: 10 waiver,
Att: 11 waiver,
Att: 12 Cover page
Friday, November 22, 2024
13 13 2 pgs motion Order Fri 11/22 11:18 AM
MOTION FOR PRAECIPE TO ISSUE ALIAS SUMMONS FILED BY DERRICK JACOBS. Certificate of Service.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SMITH on behalf of ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, MICHAEL GARISMA (SMITH, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 2:16 PM
ORDER THAT ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNLESS PLAINTIFF SERVES THE DEFENDNANTS ON OR BEFORE 12/6/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/5/24. 11/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 10:59 AM
ORDER THAT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF FOR ELECTRONIC FILING IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/3/24. 10/3/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 misc Praecipe/Request Tue 10/01 5:13 PM
Request For Electronic Filing filed by DERRICK JACOBS. Certificate of Service. (mas) (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/1/2024) cover page
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NAISH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANA CORTES, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DANIELLE OUTLAW, PHILADELPHIA POLICE LIEUTENANT CRAIG MORTON, PHILADELPHIA POLICE SERGEANT ZACHARY KOENIG AND MAILED TO PRO SE (rf, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/12/2024) (rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 09/11 3:45 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 20023370 (sbt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/22 1:20 PM
ORDER THAT MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 8/22/24. 8/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/05 7:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF DERRICK JACOBS against All Defendants, Certificate of Service.(dt) Modified on 8/5/2024 (dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ABC,
Att: 2 Exhibit D,
Att: 3 cover sheet
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 08/05 7:50 AM
APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF DERRICK JACOBS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 COVER SHEET
Thursday, July 18, 2024
3 3 order Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5 Fri 07/19 11:03 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 7/18/24. 7/19/24 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED. *APPROPRIATE NON-IFP PACKET SENT TO JACOBS*(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Mon 07/15 10:56 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. E-mailed to Plaintiff on 7/15/2024.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/15 10:51 AM
COMPLAINT against ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY PATRICIA CUMMINGS, ASSISTANT DISTRICT ATTORNEY TRACY TRIPP, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, DEPUTY CHIEF CITY SOLICITOR NICOLE MORRIS, DEPUTY CITY SOLICITOR KIA GHEE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER BENJAMIN NASH, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER DENNIS WILSON, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER FRANK VANORE, DEPUTY PHILADELPHIA POLICE COMMISSIONER ROBIN WIMBERLY, PHILADELPHIA CITY SOLICITOR DIANE CORTES, PHILADELPHIA DISTRICT ATTORNEY LAWRENCE KRASNER, PHILADELPHIA POLICE CAPTAIN CHARLES VOGT, filed by DERRICK JACOBS. (NO FEE RECEIVED, NO IFP FILED).(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Cover Letter