Member Case
Lead case is: 4:24-bk-42473

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:24-bk-42482
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hoosier Christian Village, Inc.
621 S Sugar St
Brownstown, IN 47220-2066
Represented By
Stephen O'Brien
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
5 5 10 pgs order Order Generic Multi Fri 07/19 2:21 PM
Order Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. (nel, k)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
4 4 6 pgs order Order Generic Multi Thu 07/18 9:38 AM
Order Interim Order (I) Authorizing, but not Directing, Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Employee Benefits, and Other Obligations, (B) Maintain Employee Benefit Programs, and (C) Pay Related Administrative Obligations; and (II) Granting Related Relief. (nel, k)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
3 3 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motion Tue 07/16 2:54 PM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion Re: Motion of Debtors For Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases . Filed by Debtor Hoosier Christian Village, Inc. Hearing scheduled 7/17/2024 at 02:00 PM at Bankruptcy Courtroom 7 North. (O'Brien, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Internet Credit Card Receipt Tue 07/16 9:48 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-42482 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A20096838, amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 14 pgs misc **AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Tue 07/16 8:20 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Hoosier Christian Village, Inc. (O'Brien, Stephen)
Related: [-]