Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:24-cv-03074
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
MONTGOMERY COUNTY
102 York Road
Willow Grive, PA 19090
Represented By
MAUREEN E. CALDER
Montgomery Cty Solicitor'S Office
contact info
JEFFREY S. STEWART
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
DENAE SWEENY
Represented By
WAYNE A. ELY
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Remark Fri 05/02 9:20 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 16 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/01 2:26 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED. THIS MATTER IS STAYED FOR SIXTY DAYS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 5/1/25.5/1/25 ENTERED AND MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
15 15 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/16 1:29 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by WAYNE A. ELY.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 02/06 10:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER. Pretrial Conference held on 2/5/25. (mas)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/05 3:47 PM
ORDER THAT THE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES ARE AS FOLLOWS: ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE JUNE 5, 2025;THIS DEADLINE IS INCLUSIVE OF ANY EXPERT DISCOVERY. THE PARTIES HAVE REPRESENTED THAT WITH THE EXCEPTION OF PLAINTIFFS TREATING PHYSICIAN, EXPERT TESTIMONY IS NOT ANTICIPATED. DISPOSITIVE AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE JULY 7, 2025; RESPONSES TO DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN AUGUST 7, 2025; AS NEEDED, AFTER A RULING ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE SCHEDULED BY CHAMBERS TO SET A TRIAL DATE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES. COUNSEL SHALL NOTIFY CHAMBERS IF THE PARTIES MUTUALLY AGREE TO PARTICIPATE IN A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH THE UNDERSIGNED OR A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/5/25. 2/5/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
12 12 misc Report Of Fri 01/31 11:06 AM
Report Of Rule 26f Meeting and Discovery Plan by DENAE SWEENY. (ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/30 3:47 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE: A Status Conference is scheduled for Wednesday February 5, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. with Judge Gail Weilheimer. The conference will be conducted via the ZoomGov platform. Login information will be provided to counsel by email. Lead trial counsel is required to attend the conference. If trial counsel is on trial in another matter, an attorney in his or her office who is thoroughly familiar with and prepared to discuss the substance, settlement and scheduling of this case is required to attend the Conference. Counsel should be prepared to discuss the strengths and weaknesses of the case and be completely conversant with the essential issues and facts.(rt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/16 12:58 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE TO DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/16/25. 1/16/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. STEWART on behalf of MONTGOMERY COUNTY (STEWART, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 12/18 10:34 AM
ORDER THAT A FED.R.CIV.P. 16 CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD BY VIDECONFERENCE ON 2/4/25 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 12/18/24. 12/18/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/09 2:56 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by MONTGOMERY COUNTY.(CALDER, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/09 12:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MONTGOMERY COUNTY. MONTGOMERY COUNTY waiver sent on 10/9/2024, answer due 12/9/2024. (CALDER, MAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 08/30 9:00 AM
Summons Issued as to MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/29 6:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MONTGOMERY COUNTY, filed by DENAE SWEENY.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 12:59 PM
ORDER THAT SEVEN (7) DAYS PRIOR TO ANY MOTION BEING FILED (INCLUDING A MOTION UNDERFED.R.CIV.P. 12 OR 56, 28 U.S.C. § 1441, OR 28 U.S.C. § 1404), COUNSEL MUST NOTIFYOPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE POTENTIAL MOTION, AND THE POSSIBLERESOLUTION OF SAME. THESE DISCUSSIONS SHALL BE SUBSTANTIVE AND NOT PERFUNCTORY. TOTHIS END, COUNSEL SHALL PROVIDE THE OPPOSING PARTY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANYALLEGED DEFECTS PRIOR TO FILING A MOTION; IN THE EVENT THE PARTIES ARE UNABLE TO PRELIMINARILY NEGATE THE NEED FOR THE FILING OF A MOTION AFTER ENGAGING IN SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSIONS, THE MOVING PARTY SHALL SO SPECIFY IN A CERTIFICATION ATTACHED AND FILED WITH THE MOTION. SAID CERTIFICATION SHALLINDICATE THE DATE(S) OF DISCUSSION(S) AND SHALL INFORM THE COURT OF THE PARTIESINABILITY TO REACH A RESOLUTION; FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER SHALL RESULT IN DENIAL OF THE MOTION WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KELLEY BRISBON HODGE ON 7/30/24. 7/30/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/17 10:48 AM
Summons Issued as to MONTGOMERY COUNTY. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/17/24 (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 07/16 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against MONTGOMERY COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17602855.), filed by Denae sweeny.(ELY, WAYNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Designation Form