Montana District Court
Judge:Timothy J Cavan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00089
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Case in other court:MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone Cty, DV-24-00678
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 1:54 AM MST
Defendant
City of Billings
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Marshall Glunt
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Tina Hoeger
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Cyndi Katschke
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Tanya Punt
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tonya Nichole Oberg
234 Alderson
Billings, MT 59101
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
David Griffin
Terminated: 10/23/2024
Represented By
Derek R. Graves
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord
contact info
Harlan B. Krogh
Crist, Krogh, Alke & Nord, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, May 23, 2025
24 24 motion Pro Se Motion - MT Fri 05/23 4:21 AM
Pro Se Motion by Tonya Nichole Oberg (Oberg, Tonya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/03 11:50 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2025. (BFM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order - SDM Thu 03/27 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2025. Discovery due by 12/19/2025. Motions due by 2/20/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 3/27/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
21 21 misc Pro Se Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 03/20 11:21 PM
Pro Se Preliminary Pretrial Statement by Tonya Nichole Oberg (Oberg, Tonya)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Thu 03/20 2:12 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by City of Billings, Marshall Glunt, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke, Tanya Punt. (Graves, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Mon 03/03 11:11 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by City of Billings, Marshall Glunt, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke, Tanya Punt. (Krogh, Harlan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Wed 02/05 4:41 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/20/2025. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/20/2025. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/20/2025. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2025 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 2/5/2025. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/23 4:21 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dave Griffin. All claims against Griffin in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/23/2024. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 notice Pro Se Registration Form Tue 10/15 9:13 AM
PRO SE REGISTRATION FORM by Plaintiff Tonya Nichole Oberg. (SGN)
Related: [-]
utility Pro Se PACER Approval Tue 10/15 9:16 AM
REMARK: E-filing request approved and sent to PACER for Plaintiff Tonya Nichole Oberg. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT Wed 10/09 10:26 AM
ORDER re5 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Dave Griffin filed by Marshall Glunt, Tanya Punt, City of Billings, David Griffin, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall appear in writing on or before October 18, 2024, to clarify her opposition, if any, to Griffin's motion to dismiss only the claims asserted against him. If no opposition is filed, the Court will assume Griffins motion is unopposed and will enter an order dismissing all claims against Griffin in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 10/9/2024. (Hard copy conventionally mailed to pro se plaintiff.) (JDH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
14 14 misc Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT Mon 08/19 11:50 AM
Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Pursuant to Standing Order BMM-33 and no objection having been made, this case is assigned to the United States magistrate judge to conduct all further proceedings, enter judgment and conduct all post-trial proceedings.. (JDH) Modified on 8/19/2024: Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Case Opening - MT Tue 07/23 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re1 Notice of Removal -8 COMPLAINT (IFP) filed in State Court (Copy w/docket sheet conventionally mailed to pro se plaintiff Oberg on this date.) (JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pro Se Registration Form For the Electronic Case Filing System,
Att: 2 Consent to Electronic Service
12 12 notice Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT Tue 07/23 9:37 AM
Service of Notification of Assignment to Magistrate Judge form. Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/9/2024. (Hard copy mailed to pro se plaintiff T. Oberg on this date.) (JDH)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 9:29 AM
STATE COURT ORDER - Order Setting Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Harris on 7/11/2024. (JDH)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 9:27 AM
STATE COURT ORDER - Order Granting Fee Waiver. Signed by Judge Harris on 6/13/2024. (JDH)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/23 9:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed in State Court by City of Billings, Marshall Glunt, David Griffin, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke, Tanya Punt. (JDH)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT Tue 07/23 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT (IFP) filed in State Court against All Defendants, filed by Tonya Nichole Oberg. (JDH)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of State Court File Received Tue 07/23 9:17 AM
NOTICE OF STATE COURT FILE RECEIVED from MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, case number DV 56-2024 678-OC. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court File,
Att: 2 File Receipt
Friday, July 19, 2024
6 6 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/19 3:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Dave Griffin filed by Tonya Nichole Oberg. (JLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss - SDM Wed 07/17 2:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Dave Griffin . Harlan B. Krogh appearing for Defendants City of Billings, Marshall Glunt, David Griffin, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke, Tanya Punt. (Krogh, Harlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (email),
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Derek R. Graves on behalf of All Defendants (Graves, Derek)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/17 10:13 AM
NOTICE by City of Billings, Marshall Glunt, David Griffin, Tina Hoeger, Cyndi Katschke, Tanya Punt of Service of Notice of Removal (Krogh, Harlan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan B. Krogh on behalf of All Defendants (Krogh, Harlan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal - SDM Tue 07/16 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from MT 13th Judicial District Court, Yellowstone County, case number DV 56-2024 678., filed by All Defendants. (JDH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Summons Served,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Answer to Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Ordre Setting Scheduling Conference,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 07/16 4:25 PM
Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AMTDC-329537 (JDH)
Related: [-]