Joseph Rouse v. 207 Knickerbocker LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Natasha C Merle |
Referred: | Lara K Eshkenazi |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04944 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
207 Knickerbocker LLC
|
|
Defendant
Leos Deli Grocery INC
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Rouse
Barducci Law Firm PLLC 5 West 19 St 10th Fl.
New York, NY 10011 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, February 28, 2025 | ||
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/28 12:01 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG) |
||
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as against 207 Knickerbocker LLC by 207 Knickerbocker LLC (Yokos, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 02/19 10:24 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn. Plaintiff is directed to submit the Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by 03/19/2025 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 2/19/2025. (MED) |
||
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Joseph Rouse. (Barducci, Maria) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Joseph Rouse (Barducci, Maria) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 01/07 12:52 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is pleased to learn that the parties have reached a settlement in principle. The Default Conference scheduled for 01/08/2025 is adjourned sine die . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 1/7/2025. (MED) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 01/07 12:56 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a stipulation of voluntary dismissal by 02/19/2025 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 1/7/2025. (MED) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for Docket, Court Order, Summons served on Defendants on 12/9/2024, filed by Joseph Rouse. (Barducci, Maria) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 12/04 12:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person Default Conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 01/08/2025 at 10:30am in courtroom N322 . Although Defendants have not appeared in this case, they may appear at the conference. Plaintiff has represented that Defendants have been served with the Complaint1 , which is the document that states Plaintiff's claims against Defendants. Should Plaintiff move for a default judgment, Defendants could be liable because they have not responded to this lawsuit by answering it or moving to dismiss. If Defendants do not participate in the lawsuit now, they would likely waive their right to raise factual or legal defenses that they may have to Plaintiff's claims. By 01/01/2025, Plaintiff shall file proof of service of this ORDER and the docket sheet upon Defendants. Plaintiff shall attempt to serve Defendants at their business address. The Court will mail a copy of this order, the Complaint, and the docket sheet to 207 Knickerbocker Avenue, Brooklyn, New York 11237. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 12/4/2024. (MED) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STATUS REPORT by Joseph Rouse (Barducci, Maria) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Wed 11/20 3:43 PM
ORDER: According to the proof of services filed on 11/18/2024, Defendants deadline to answer the Complaint was 08/16/2024. To date, Defendants have not appeared in this matter. Plaintiff is directed to file a letter by 11/26/2024 advising the Court on his efforts to communicate with Defendants in this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 11/20/2024. (MED) |
||
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Rouse. Leos Deli Grocery INC served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (Barducci, Maria) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Rouse. 207 Knickerbocker LLC served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. (Barducci, Maria) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Mon 11/18 3:48 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Plaintiff was supposed to serve the complaint on Defendants by 10/15/2024. To date, no proof of service has been filed. Plaintiff is directed to file a status letter advising the Court on whether he has served Defendants by 11/25/2024 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi on 11/18/2024. (MED) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to 207 Knickerbocker LLC, Leos Deli Grocery INC. (KD) |
|
4 | 4
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/17 9:11 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Joseph Rouse (Barducci, Maria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against 207 Knickerbocker LLC, Leos Deli Grocery INC filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18076240 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Joseph Rouse. (Barducci, Maria) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |