District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:24-cv-02068
Nature of Suit210 Real Property - Land Condemnation
Cause43:945 Compensation for Land Condemnation
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 3:57 AM EST
Counter Claimant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Oliver W McDaniel
Doj-Usao
contact info
Counter Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Andrew Glover
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Cross Claimant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Oliver W McDaniel
Doj-Usao
contact info
Cross Defendant
CG MARKETPLACE, LLC
Represented By
Edward S. Scheideman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Brett Ingerman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Cross Defendant
DC HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By
David E. Hawkins
The Hawkins Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ALL OF THE PARCEL OF LAND IDENTIFIED AS SQUARE 5246, LOT 110
Defendant
BRIAN J CANNON
Represented By
James Taylor Heidelbach
Gebhardt & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
CG MARKETPLACE, LLC
Represented By
Edward S. Scheideman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Brett Ingerman
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Defendant
DC HOUSING AUTHORITY
Represented By
David E. Hawkins
The Hawkins Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
PNC BANK, N. A.
Represented By
James Taylor Heidelbach
Gebhardt & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
PATRICK G TEHAN
Represented By
James Taylor Heidelbach
Gebhardt & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By
Oliver W. McDaniel
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Oliver W McDaniel
Doj-Usao
contact info
Melissa Elaine Goforth Koenig
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Andrew Glover
Office Of The Attorney General For The District Of Columbia
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
35 35 motion Confirm Fri 05/09 4:13 PM
MOTION to Confirm the Validity of the Taking by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, May 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/05 6:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The32 Motion for Extension of the Briefing Schedule is GRANTED; and 2) The Government shall file its response to Defendant CG Marketplace's Motion to Dismiss by May 23, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/5/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 05/02 12:50 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re32 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION for Extension of the Briefing Schedule (Partially Consent to)) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
33 33 6 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Thu 05/01 1:51 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re32 MOTION for Extension of the Briefing Schedule (Partially Consent to) filed by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC. (Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/30 3:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of the Briefing Schedule (Partially Consent to) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 04/30 6:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that should any party oppose the United States's32 Motion for Extension, it shall file such Opposition by May 2, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/30/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
31 31 motion Dismiss Wed 04/09 5:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC.(Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/08 9:08 PM
Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(zjm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
29 29 respm Response to motion Fri 04/04 1:45 PM
RESPONSE re28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Partially Unopposed) filed by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC. (Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 04/04 6:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The28 Motion for Leave to File is GRANTED; and 2) The Second Amended Answer attached to that Motion shall be deemed filed. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/4/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Tue 04/01 5:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer (Partially Unopposed) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Second Amended Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit A (DCHAs Annual Contributions Contract with HUD),
Att: 4 Exhibit B (Deed of Partial Release of Declaration of Trust),
Att: 5 Exhibit C (Standard Terms and Conditions of the Grant Agreement),
Att: 6 Exhibit D (Executed HUD Form 1044),
Att: 7 Exhibit E (HUD Special Application Centers Approval),
Att: 8 Exhibit F (Part 941, subpart F),
Att: 9 Exhibit G (Contract for Redevelopment)
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/01 6:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that if CG Marketplace opposes the United States's28 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer, it shall file such Opposition by April 7, 2025. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/1/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 03/18 2:18 PM
STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/18 5:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Phase One deadlines in the parties'27 Status Report and will have a status hearing to determine the Phase Two deadlines after the Court decides the Phase One motions. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/18/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
26 26 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 3:28 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
25 25 misc Status Report Fri 02/28 10:45 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/28 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'25 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) The period for mediation shall be extended until March 10, 2025; and 2) The parties shall either file a joint proposed scheduling order or request a status hearing to address any disputes by that date. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/28/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 02/04 4:33 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, CG MARKETPLACE, LLC, PNC BANK, N. A., BRIAN J CANNON, PATRICK G TEHAN, DC HOUSING AUTHORITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Hawkins, David)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/04 11:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'24 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) The period for mediation shall be extended until February 28, 2025; and 2) The parties shall file a joint status report by that date. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2025. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
23 23 misc Status Report Mon 11/25 8:35 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/25 9:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER : The Court ADOPTS the parties'23 Joint Status Reports and ORDERS that: 1) The period for mediation shall be extended until February 3, 2025; and 2) The parties shall file a joint status report by that date. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/25/2024. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
22 22 order .Order Tue 10/01 12:30 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint request to refer this case to the Circuit Mediation Program, the Court hereby ORDERS that: 1) ) By separate Order, the Court will order the Clerk to refer the case to the Circuit Mediation Program through December 2, 2024; 2) Mediation shall occur from October 2, 2024, through December 2, 2024; and 3) The parties shall file a joint status report by December 2, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/1/2024. (lcjeb4) Modified on 10/1/2024 (znbn)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Status Report Tue 10/01 8:33 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
order .Order Tue 10/01 12:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties'21 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that: 1) By separate Order, the case shall be referred to the Circuit Mediation Program through December 2, 2024; and 2) By that same date, the parties shall submit a further joint status report. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/1/2024. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 10/01 2:51 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 12/2/2024. Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2024. (znbn)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office Only) Mon 10/07 12:31 PM
CASE REFERRED to Circuit Mediation Program (see22 Order for Mediation). (znbn)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/20 11:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held via Zoom on 9/20/2024. Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2024. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn)
Related: [-]
order .Order Fri 09/20 2:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that by October 4, 2024, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report indicating their preferences regarding mediation. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/20/2024. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 08/29 5:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER: As the United States has now filed an18 Amended Answer without a Counterclaim, the Court ORDERS that the District of Columbia's10 Motion to Strike Counterclaim is DENIED as moot. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/29/2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
order Order on Motion to Substitute Party Wed 08/28 10:11 AM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent20 Motion to Substitute Party. The Court ORDERS that the United States is substituted in place of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/28/2024. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
20 20 motion Substitute Party Tue 08/27 8:17 PM
Consent MOTION to Substitute Party U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT FOR THE UNITED STATES by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/27 3:23 PM
NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA'S MOTION TO STRIKE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT re10 Motion to Strike (McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/27 2:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Standard Terms and Conditions of the Grant Agreement),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Executed HUD Form 1044),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Deed of Partial Release of Declaration of Trust)
Monday, August 26, 2024
order .Order Mon 08/26 9:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER: A Joint Status Conference is set for September 20, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/26/24. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 08/26 9:34 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/20/2024 at 10:30 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/23 5:15 PM
Joint MOTION - Joint Request For Status Conference by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC. (Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/23 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Ingerman on behalf of CG MARKETPLACE, LLC (Ingerman, Brett)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/23 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Elaine Goforth Koenig on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Goforth Koenig, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/15 9:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brett Ingerman is GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/15/24. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/14 6:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brett Ingerman, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11092963. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC.(Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brett Ingerman, ESQ
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Crossclaim Tue 08/13 11:09 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim9 by DC HOUSING AUTHORITY.(Hawkins, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Crossclaim Tue 08/13 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim9 by CG MARKETPLACE, LLC.(Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Strike Tue 08/13 4:23 PM
MOTION to Strike9 Answer to Complaint,,, Crossclaim,,, COUNTERCLAIM,, by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
17 17 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Tue 08/27 11:31 AM
Receipt on 8/12/2024 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2022-CA-002424.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim Tue 07/23 8:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) , CROSSCLAIM against DC HOUSING AUTHORITY, CG MARKETPLACE, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Standard Terms and Conditions of the Grant Agreement),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Executed HUD Form 1044),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Deed of Partial Release of Declaration of Trust),
Att: 4 DOCUMENT (DECEMBER 12, 2023, SUA SPONTE ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT),
Att: 5 DOCUMENT (ORIG. COMPLAINT)
Monday, July 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Mon 07/22 10:14 AM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal,(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/22 10:12 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward S. Scheideman on behalf of CG MARKETPLACE, LLC (Scheideman, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Glover on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Glover, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 misc Errata Wed 07/17 3:21 PM
ERRATA (Notice of Errata) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT re Notice of Error- New Case,.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corrected Notice of Removal of a Civil Action
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Taylor Heidelbach on behalf of BRIAN J CANNON, PNC BANK, N. A., PATRICK G TEHAN (Heidelbach, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Hawkins on behalf of DC HOUSING AUTHORITY (Hawkins, David)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Error- New Case Wed 07/17 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF NEW CASE ERROR regarding1 Notice of Removal,. The following error(s) need correction: Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file a Notice of Errata stating the error and attach the corrected initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party and file using the event Errata. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
2 2 cmp Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED) Tue 07/16 6:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT re1 Notice of Removal, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Related document:1 Notice of Removal, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 07/16 6:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2022 CA 002424 E(RP) (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(McDaniel, Oliver)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Amended Complaint)