California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02632
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 17, 2024 12:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos (2)
Represented By
Jorge Javier Jaramillo
The Law Office Of Jorge Jaramillo
contact info
Defendant
Anabell Medina (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Mayra Lopez
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Keith D. Ellison
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/17/2024 12:52 AM PDT
Saturday, July 13, 2024
Arrest of Anabell Medina, Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Anabell Medina, Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos.(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Anabell Medina, Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos: Initial Appearance set for 7/15/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Keith D. Ellison appearing for USA. (Ellison, Keith)Attorney Keith D. Ellison added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi).
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu: Initial Appearance as to Anabell Medina, Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos held on 7/15/2024. Financial affidavits filed. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Anabell Medina and Jorge Javier Jaramillo for Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos. Bond set as to Anabell Medina (1) 10,000P/S + 1 FRRA + 10% cash deposit and Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos (2) 20,000P/S + 1FRA + 10% cash deposit. Request for defendant Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos to be released same day; Denied. Rule 5 advisement provided. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/23/24 at 1:30 pm before Judge Steve B.Chu. Arraignment set for 8/06/24 at 1:30 pm before Judge Steve B.Chu. (Interpreter Ariela Edelson Torenberg, Elizabeth Torres). (CD# 7/15/2024 SBC 24: 2:33-2:43; 3:39-3:54). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete/ Brendan Barber, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jamie Schmid/Samuel Pope, FD). (dxj)
Related: [-]
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Anabell Medina (no document attached) (dxj)
Related: [-]
6 6 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos (no document attached) (dxj)
Related: [-]
9 9 BRADY ORDER as to Anabell Medina: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 7/15/2024. (mxl)
Related: [-]
10 10 BRADY ORDER as to Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 7/15/2024. (mxl)
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos (ecf)
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Anabell Medina (ecf)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Jesus Emanuel Garibo Arcos (2) 20,000P/S + 1FRA + 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 7/15/24. (ecf)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Anabell Medina (1) 10,000P/S + 1 FRRA + 10% cash deposit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve B. Chu on 7/15/24. (ecf)
Related: [-]