Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:24-cv-01282
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Case in other court:District Court, Clark County, Nevada, A-24-894564-C
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Mercury Casualty Company
Represented By
Christine M. Emanuelson
Hines Hampton Pelanda LLP
contact info
Tami Kay Lee
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Nicole M. Hampton
Hines Hampton Pelandallp
contact info
Plaintiff
Triantafyllos Koletsis
Represented By
Paul A Shpirt
C/o Dimopoulos Law Firm
contact info
Steve Dimopoulos
Dimopoulos Injury Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominique Shadi Adelia
Represented By
Paul A Shpirt
C/o Dimopoulos Law Firm
contact info
Steve Dimopoulos
Dimopoulos Injury Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case Thu 10/03 10:13 AM
ORDER granting15 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Based on the parties stipulation, this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/2/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation Wed 10/02 1:45 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS with Prejudice by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine) (dismiss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/04 10:00 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/7/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III on 9/3/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
13 13 motion Stipulation Fri 08/30 5:52 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
order Standing Order Wed 08/28 10:43 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. Judge Couvillier's Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 08/14 11:56 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
10 10 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 08/01 10:16 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/24 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Mercury Casualty Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/3/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/7/2024.(Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 07/24 11:57 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
7 7 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 07/18 3:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 7/18/2024. By Deputy Clerk: ALZ. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/2/2024. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 8/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/17 12:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triantafyllos Koletsis, Dominique Shadi Adeli. Mercury Casualty Company served on 6/18/2024. (Shpirt, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 07/17 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dominique Shadi Adeli, Triantafyllos Koletsis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Shpirt, Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/17 8:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate of Service Wed 07/17 8:35 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Mercury Casualty Company. (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 07/17 8:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mercury Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Wed 07/17 8:33 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-24-894564-C, (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANVDC-7748032) by Mercury Casualty Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/27/2024. (Emanuelson, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 07/18 1:09 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (ALZ)
Related: [-]