Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:24-cv-00057
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 1:20 AM MST
Defendant
Snowflake, Inc.
Represented By
Bailey Marie Nickoloff
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Brianne C. McClafferty
Holland & Hart - Billings
contact info
Delaney Gold-Diamond
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Stephen Broome
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John R. Wilkinson
Represented By
John C. Heenan
Heenan & Cook
contact info
Kennedy Marie Brian
Federman & Sherwood
contact info

GPO Aug 06 2024
s.gov/sites/mtd/files/PHV_Instructions.pdf>here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/21/2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/6/2024. (KAH)ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney n A. Broome and Delaney Gold-Diamond. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here.; granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney n A. Broome and Delaney Gold-Diamond. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found
GPO Sep 03 2024
owflake Inc. to a new MDL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (MDL No. 3126). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/3/2024. (MMS)ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 23 Motion to Stay. The above-listed actions shall be CONSOLIDATED for all purposes into the first-filed action, which is the case with the lowest number. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed in Case No. 2:24-cv-00046 which shall hereinafter be a Consolidated Action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the remaining actions. 2. Each new case that arises out of the subject matter of the Consolidated Action which is filed in this Court or transferred to this Court, shall be consolidated with the Consolidated Action and this Order shall apply thereto, unless a party objects to consolidation, as provided for herein, or any provision of this Order, within ten (10) days after the date upon which a copy of this Order is served on counsel for such party, by filing an application for relief and this Court deems it appropriate to grant such application. Nothing in the forgoing shall be construed as a waiver of Defendants right to object to consolidation of any subsequently filed or transferred related action; 3.This case briefing is STAYED pending the JPMLs decision on the Motion to Transfer all cases related to the data incident at Sn
GPO Sep 09 2024
AMENDED ORDER: The above-listed actions shall be CONSOLIDATED for all purposes into the first-filed action, which is the case with the lowest number. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers EXCEPT FOR MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE, which will be filed in each specific case, shall be filed in Case No. 2:24-cv-00046 which shall hereinafter be a Consolidated Action. All other cases will remain open. 2. Each new case that arises out of the subject matter of the Consolidated Action which is filed in this Court or transferred to this Court, shall be consolidated with the Consolidated Action and this Order shall apply thereto, unless a party objects to consolidation, as provided for herein, or objects to any provision of this Order. If a party objects to consolidation or to any provision of this Order, an application for relief must be filed within ten (10) days after the date upon which the new case was filed. Nothing in the forgoing shall be construed as a waiver of Defendants right to object to consolidation of any subsequently filed or transferred related action; 3.This case briefing is STAYED pending the JPMLs decision on the Motion to Transfer all cases related to the data incident at Snowflake Inc. to a new MDL pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (MDL No. 3126). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/9/2024. Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-00046-BMM et al. (MMS)
GPO Feb 13 2025
ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/04/2025. (MMS)

Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
61 61 motion Leave to File Under Seal - SDM Fri 05/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC, Defendants Lendingtree, LLC, LendingTree, LLC, Lendingtree, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM-JTJ et al. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H