Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Bernard M Jones
Case #: 5:24-cv-00720
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Terminated:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 2:33 AM CST
Defendant
Department of Justice
Plaintiff
Faith Community Baptist Church
#2300216 6887 SH 198
Mabank, TX 75156


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
5 5 order Judgment Tue 07/30 10:05 AM
JUDGMENT ~ In accordance with the Court's Order entered on this date, Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/30/2024. (dwl)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 10:01 AM
ORDER ~ The Court ordered Faith Church to pay the fee in full by July 26, 2024.2 . Faith Church was warned that its failure to comply with the Court's order could result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. Faith Church's action is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate judgment will issue. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/30/2024. (dwl)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Mon 07/29 1:53 PM
LETTER from Faith Community Baptist Church (naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, July 19, 2024
2 2 2 pgs order Order Fri 07/19 11:46 AM
ORDER ~ re1 Complaint filed by Faith Community Baptist Church. Faith Church's initial pleading was filed by Jay Williams, who is currently incarcerated in Texas. Accordingly, by July 26, 2024, Faith Church shall pay the $405.00 filing fee to proceed with its action. Faith Church is warned that its failure to comply with this present Order could result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Bernard M. Jones on 7/19/2024. (dwl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/17 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against Department of Justice filed by Faith Community Baptist Church.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Request,
Att: 2 Envelope