Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 1:24-cv-02054
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/29 5:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler, Ronald Shane Weber.(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of J. Clise (WCI)
Monday, April 07, 2025
42 42 corresp Miscellaneous Tue 04/08 11:28 AM
Amendment by interlineation correcting unsworn declaration at Exhibit 4., filed by George Bobbitt.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 21, 2025
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/21 10:44 AM
ORDER granting40 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 3/21/2025. (c/m 03/21/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/21 8:08 AM
Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment ,36 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler, Ronald Shane Weber(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 20, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/20 8:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment ,36 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler, Ronald Shane Weber(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
38 38 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/20 4:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Solaide Akintade, Sandra Boettinger.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit D
Friday, March 07, 2025
37 37 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 03/10 4:34 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 4:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit List,
Att: 13 Envelope
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/10 4:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Envelope
Friday, February 21, 2025
34 34 corresp Correcting earlier submission Fri 02/21 7:35 AM
Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission:26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,, Motion for Summary Judgment,,, correcting typographical error in subheading p. 12 §IV.A to conform with argument (Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/30 11:08 AM
ORDER granting32 MOTION to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 1/30/2025. (c/m 01/30/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
32 32 motion Extension of Time Wed 01/29 3:19 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, January 13, 2025
31 31 misc Rule 12/56 Mon 01/13 9:16 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Mr. George T. Bobbitt (c/m 01/13/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
30 30 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 5:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Sandra Boettinger, Solaide Akintade(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 16 Exhibit B,
Att: 17 Exhibit C,
Att: 18 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 19 Exhibit A-1
29 29 misc Rule 12/56 Fri 01/10 11:20 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Mr. George T. Bobbitt (c/m 01/10/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Seal Fri 01/10 8:23 AM
MOTION to Seal Ex. 4 (medical records) to ECF 26 Correctional Defendants' Dispositive Motion by Ronald Shane Weber, Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
27 27 notice Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal Fri 01/10 8:19 AM
-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Ex. 4 to ECF 26 Correctional Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Medical Records filed under seal) by Ronald Shane Weber, Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler re26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 4 to ECF 26 MTDSJ - medical records under seal
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Summary Judgment Fri 01/10 8:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Shane Weber, Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Attachment Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 Fully Executed Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of M. Cohen,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 Declaration J. Clise (WCI),
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 Placeholder Medical Records Under Seal,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 Declaration of B. Butler,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Warden Weber,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 Declaration of R. Emerick,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 Declaration of K. Donnelly (HQ),
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Dr. S. Baucom,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 Declaration of A. Odunze,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 Declaration of C. Shriver (ACOM),
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 Declaration of O. Jerkins,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 Declaration of J. Miller (MTCA),
Att: 16 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 23, 2024
25 25 respm Response Mon 12/23 11:22 AM
RESPONSE re22 Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,,,,,,,, re Order to Identify Defendants filed by YesCare Schedular.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/23 11:17 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by YesCare Utilization Management Medical Director. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/23 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of YesCare Utilization Management Medical Director (Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/16 12:58 PM
ORDER dismissing18 Amended Complaint as to Defendant YesCare John/Jane Doe; granting19 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint; granting in part20 MOTION for Extension of Time ; granting in part21 Second MOTION for Extension of Time; directing the Clerk to electronically send copy of Amended Complaint to Megan Mantzavinos and withhold service to Defendants YesCare Scheduler and YesCare Utilization Management Medical Director; directing counsel to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re18 Amended Complaint, filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments . Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 12/16/2024. (c/m and c/em 12/16/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/11 3:23 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time by Sandra Boettinger, Solaide Akintade(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, November 11, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/11 1:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Sandra Boettinger, Solaide Akintade(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/08 7:33 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to complaint by Sharom Baucom, Bradley Butler, Ronald Shane Weber(Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/16 1:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Solaide Akintade, Sharom Baucom, Sandra Boettinger, Ronald Shane Weber, Bradley Butler, YesCare Schedular, YesCare John/Jane Doe, YesCare Utilization Management Medical Director, filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
17 17 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 10/16 11:52 AM
Correspondence from Mr. George T. Bobbitt re: Correct Identification Number(docket updated 10/16/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, September 23, 2024
misc Filing Fee Paid Mon 09/23 3:37 PM
Filing fee: $23.54, receipt number 10098 (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 09/19 4:33 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Solaide Akintade, Sandra Boettinger. Solaide Akintade waiver sent on 9/11/2024, answer due 11/12/2024; Sandra Boettinger waiver sent on 9/11/2024, answer due 11/12/2024.(Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of Solaide Akintade, Sandra Boettinger (Mantzavinos, Megan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Kelly on behalf of Sharom Baucom, Ronald Shane Weber (Kelly, Teresa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 corresp Accepting/Declining Service Tue 09/17 2:48 PM
Correspondence re: accepting service on behalf of Ronald Shane Weber and declining service on behalf of Solaide Akintade, Sharom Baucom, Sandra Boettinger.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
12 12 5 pgs order Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 09/11 1:41 PM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to update the docket to reflect Defendants as described herein; denying without prejudice6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; directing Mr. Bobbitt to make monthly payments with the initial partial filing fee due within twenty-one days of this Order; directing the Finance Officer at WCI to forward described payments to the Clerk; granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to electronically transmit a copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint (7 Supplement, filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt,1 Complaint filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments . Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/11/2024. (c/m to P and FO, c/em as directed 09/11/2024 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Institutional Coordinator Letter
Monday, August 26, 2024
11 11 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 08/27 2:33 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/27 2:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 2:31 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Solaide Akintade, Sharom Baucom, Sandra Boettinger, Chief Medical Officer, Corizon Health, Inc., Warden, Ronald Shane Weber, Yes Care, Inc., filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
8 8 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 08/27 2:29 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 2:26 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Solaide Akintade, Sharom Baucom, Sandra Boettinger, Chief Medical Officer, Corizon Health, Inc., Warden, Ronald Shane Weber, Yes Care, Inc., filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 08/27 2:19 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 08/27 2:18 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/27 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mr. George T. Bobbitt(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 4 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 10:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to file a Supplemental Complaint and a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee; DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (contained in ECF No. 1); DIRECTING Clerk to MAIL a copy of this Order together with a civil rights packet and a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis form to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/24/2024. (c/m w/enclosures) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 07/17 2:02 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Mr. George T. Bobbitt. (c/m 7/17/24 - jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/17 1:57 PM
COMPLAINT against ATP, Sharon Baucom, Utilization Management, Mr. Richard Shane Weber, filed by Mr. George T. Bobbitt.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope