New Jersey District Court
Judge:Evelyn Padin
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-07770
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
MATT HACKET
Represented By
ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt Cappelli & Tipton LLC
contact info
Defendant
VANESSA HENDERSON
Represented By
ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt Cappelli & Tipton LLC
contact info
Defendant
RUSSO
Represented By
ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt Cappelli & Tipton LLC
contact info
Defendant
SUSSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By
ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt Cappelli & Tipton LLC
contact info
Defendant
VERNON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON
Florio Perrucci Steinhardt Cappelli & Tipton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL HANSON
422 PRESTON ROAD
TERRYVILLE, CT 06776

GPO Apr 08 2025
OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/8/2025. (ld)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
11 11 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Thu 04/24 12:23 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1779 for10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by PAUL HANSON. USCA Case Manager Stephanie (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3sb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
10 10 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Mon 04/21 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Order on Motion to Dismiss,8 Opinion by PAUL HANSON. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number NEW 51851. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (and)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/09 2:46 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Dismiss; that the Complaint, D.E. 1, is DISMISSED with prejudice; that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/8/2025. (ld)(n/m)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs order Opinion Wed 04/09 2:42 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Evelyn Padin on 4/8/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/03 5:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by PAUL HANSON re6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (mxw, )(n.m.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/04 11:34 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 10/7/2024 before Judge Evelyn Padin. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 09/03 5:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/23/2024.(MARCON, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/03 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH HOWARD MARCON on behalf of All Defendants(MARCON, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 1:20 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATT HACKET, VANESSA HENDERSON, RUSSO, SUSSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, VERNON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
cmp Complaint Thu 07/25 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against MATT HACKET, VANESSA HENDERSON, RUSSO, SUSSEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, VERNON TOWNSHIP POLICE DEPARTMENT (Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number NEW50567), filed by PAUL HANSON. See doc.1 (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Wed 07/17 4:02 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (mj)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Wed 07/17 4:00 PM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
1 1 service Complaint Received Wed 07/17 9:44 AM
Complaint Received. (mj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope