Utah District Court
Judge:David Nuffer
Referred: Paul Kohler
Case #: 4:24-cv-00063
Nature of Suit441 Civil Rights - Voting
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 1:42 AM MST
Defendant
Tanielle Callaway
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Jon Whittaker
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Wayne County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Washington County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Steven C. Wall
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Tooele County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Sullivan
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Felicia Snow
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Shaw
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Sevier County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Salt Lake County
Represented By
David A. Miller
Salt Lake County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
William G. Garbina
Salt Lake County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Marki Rowley
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Piute County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Camille Moore
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Millard County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Ginger McMullin
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Chameill Lamb
Defendant
Kane County
Represented By
Robert C. Van Dyke
Kane County Attorneys Ofc
contact info
Defendant
Juab County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Beaver County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Von J. Christiansen
Beaver County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Iron County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Lannie K Chapman
Represented By
David A. Miller
Salt Lake County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
William G. Garbina
Salt Lake County District Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Deidre Henderson
Represented By
Kyle J. Kaiser
contact info
Scott D. Cheney
contact info
Defendant
Kali Gleave
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Davis County
Represented By
Neal C. Geddes
Davis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Brian McKenzie
Represented By
Neal C. Geddes
Davis County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Garfield County
Represented By
Eric W. Clarke
Washington County Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Gillespie
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Topham
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelsie Topham
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Camille Topham
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Marsha Gillespie
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanner Gillespie
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joshua Horlacher
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LaJuana Robinson
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Colby Jenkins
Represented By
Anthony J. Ferate
contact info
R. Scott Young
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Courtney D. Powell
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Thu 08/22 12:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/22 3:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated per33 Notice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler no longer assigned to case (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 08/12 12:45 PM
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time: all defendants have until 9/9/24 to respond to 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 8/12/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/09 6:05 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Washington County. Motions referred to Paul Kohler.(Clarke, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Von J. Christiansen on behalf of Beaver County (Christiansen, Von)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/29 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Clarke on behalf of Beaver County, Tanielle Callaway, Kali Gleave, Juab County, Ginger McMullin, Millard County, Piute County, Marki Rowley, Tracy Shaw, Felicia Snow, Tooele County, Wayne County (Clarke, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 2:30 PM
ORDER Supplementing 27 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/23/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
27 27 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Tue 07/23 2:29 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/23/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
25 25 misc Transcript Purchase Notice Tue 07/23 9:44 AM
Transcript Purchased by: Kyle Kaiser re24 transcript of 7/19/24 (alt)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Transcript Tue 07/23 9:40 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO Motion Hearing held on July 19, 2024, before Judge David Nuffer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tasha A. Sisneros, Telephone number 435-773-5115. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 8/12/2024. Redaction Request due 9/3/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2024 (alt)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/22 11:07 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/22/2024. (pjd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/22 11:47 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anthony J. Ferate for Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/22/24 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/22 11:54 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Courtney D. Powell for Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 7/22/24 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt)
Related: [-]
misc Modification of Docket Mon 07/22 11:58 AM
Modification of Docket re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Error: Motion requesting 2 possible reliefs was filed with only one relief selected. Correction: Second relief, "Preliminary Injunction" will be added and entry text corrected. (alt)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 20, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Sat 07/20 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Clarke on behalf of Garfield County, Iron County, Camille Moore, Sevier County, Ryan Sullivan, Steven C. Wall, Washington County, Jon Whittaker (Clarke, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Cheney on behalf of Deidre Henderson (Cheney, Scott)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Miller on behalf of Lannie K Chapman, Salt Lake County (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Garbina on behalf of Lannie K Chapman, Salt Lake County (Garbina, William)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Geddes on behalf of Davis County, Brian McKenzie (Geddes, Neal)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Notice of Filing Fri 07/19 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF FILING of Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction re5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Expedited Hearing Requested) filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Oliver James Semans, Sr.
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle J. Kaiser on behalf of Deidre Henderson (Kaiser, Kyle)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Van Dyke on behalf of Kane County (Van Dyke, Robert)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/23 10:05 AM
Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer: Status Conference held on 7/19/2024. All parties are present by Zoom video conference. Counsel makes appearances for the record. The court grants6 Motion Expedite Hearing on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs and7 Motion for Leave to Appear By Video Conference. Discussion held on docket entry12 DECLARATION of Scott Young and the service status for this hearing. Mr. Young reports that he has received confirmation of service for all parties except Juab County. Discussion held on Utah Code Ann. 20A-3a-401 (5) and (6). Discussion held on evidence regarding cure letters being late or cure opportunity being impaired and evidence of postmarking policies and practice regarding USPS facilities in Las Vegas and Salt Lake City. Discussion held regarding duty to obtain timely postmark on ballot, and on evidence regarding Voter Plaintiffs deposit of ballots before last USPS pickup. For the reasons stated on the record the court denies5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Attorney for Plaintiff: Scott Young, Anthony J. Ferate and Courtney D. Powell, Attorney for Defendant: Kyle J. Kaiser, Scott D. Cheney, Stanford Purser, William G. Garbina, Perry Davis, Eric Clarke, Neal C. Geddes, Sam Woodall,. Court Reporter: Tasha Sisneros.(Time Start: 12:01, Time End: 12:43, Room 2B St. George Zoom Video Conference.)(pjd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 misc Declaration Thu 07/18 4:28 PM
DECLARATION of Scott Young, Esq. re11 Notice (Other), filed by Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham. (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/18 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Verified Complaint and Service on Defendants by Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham re9 Amended Complaint (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/18 3:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants. filed by Richard Topham, Michael Gillespie, Colby Jenkins, Camille Topham, Marsha Gillespie, LaJuana Robinson, Kelsie Topham, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher. (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video Thu 07/18 11:59 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear By Video Conference filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 motion Expedite Thu 07/18 11:57 AM
MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham. (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 07/18 11:54 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Expedited Hearing Requested) filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Bill,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Voters,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas Makel
4 4 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Thu 07/18 10:51 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Courtney D. Powell , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5127947, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry) Thu 07/18 10:42 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Ferate , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5127907, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiffs Marsha Gillespie, Michael Gillespie, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher, Colby Jenkins, LaJuana Robinson, Camille Topham, Kelsie Topham, Richard Topham.(Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Application,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice PHV Requirements Thu 07/18 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice e-mailed to attorney A.J. Ferate and Courtney Powell for Colby Jenkins. (kec)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/18 8:35 AM
Judge David Nuffer added. Case number will now read 4:24-cv-00063-DN. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec)
Related: [-]
notice Notice From the Court Thu 07/18 12:42 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT re6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction ,7 MOTION for Leave to Appear By Video Conference ,5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Expedited Hearing Requested) . Plaintiffs seek the setting of an expedited hearing on their5 Motion filed today, July 18, 2024. According to the docket, service of the1 Complaint and5 Motion has not been completed on any of the named Defendants. When Plaintiffs' counsel has provided proof of service on all Defendants and provided the court with the contact information for each Defendant's counsel, the court will then set a hearing date and provide notice to all parties. (apm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 07/18 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING : Status Conference set for 7/19/2024 at 12:00 PM in STGU- St George *virtual Court Via Zoom Conference* before Judge David Nuffer. (pjd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Wed 07/17 8:31 PM
COMPLAINT (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order to be filed separately) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5127453) filed by Richard Topham, Michael Gillespie, Colby Jenkins, Camille Topham, Marsha Gillespie, LaJuana Robinson, Kelsie Topham, Tanner Gillespie, Joshua Horlacher. (Young, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet