Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-02012
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Defendant
Guillermo Hernandez-Licerio (1)
Represented By
Raymond Meza, Jr.
Law Office Of Ray Meza, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 07/18/2024 3:20 AM CDT
Monday, July 15, 2024
Arrest of Guillermo Hernandez-Licerio (drda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Guillermo Hernandez-Licerio. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Guillermo Hernandez-Licerio. (drda)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Guillermo Hernandez-Licerio. (drda)
Related: [-]