District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Loren L Alikhan
Case #: 1:24-cv-02104
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Terminated:Oct 16, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:20 AM EST
Defendant
ANTONY BLINKEN
Represented By
M. Jared Littman
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ANDREW SCHOFER
Represented By
M. Jared Littman
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
SAMAN ANSAR
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info
Plaintiff
ANSAR AHMED MAJOKA
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info
Plaintiff
TAHA ANSAR MAJOKA
Represented By
Joshua L. Goldstein
Goldstein Immigration Lawyers
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order .Order Tue 10/15 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss5 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Loren L. AliKhan on 10/15/2024. (lclla2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/14 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SAMAN ANSAR, ANSAR AHMED MAJOKA, TAHA ANSAR MAJOKA (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
7 7 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 10/03 5:28 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re5 Motion to Dismiss filed by ANTONY BLINKEN, ANDREW SCHOFER.(Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Abdi v. Blinken, DDC 24-1600 (RDM), Hearing Transcript 9.16.24
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
6 6 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 10/01 4:14 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re5 Motion to Dismiss filed by SAMAN ANSAR, ANSAR AHMED MAJOKA, TAHA ANSAR MAJOKA.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
5 5 motion Dismiss Wed 09/18 6:35 AM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Thereof by ANTONY BLINKEN, ANDREW SCHOFER. (Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of ANTONY BLINKEN, ANDREW SCHOFER (Littman, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 08/02 11:49 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/22/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2024.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/29/24., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ANTONY BLINKEN served on 7/29/2024; ANDREW SCHOFER served on 7/29/2024 (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 07/19 8:28 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 07/19 8:26 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Loren L. AliKhan. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Thu 07/18 8:55 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against ANTONY BLINKEN, ANDREW SCHOFER ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11034135) filed by ANSAR AHMED MAJOKA, TAHA ANSAR MAJOKA, SAMAN ANSAR.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons