Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00673
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78n(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 2:49 AM CST
Consol Defendant
Cole Brown
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Consol Defendant
Ganesh Jayaram
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Consol Defendant
David G. Seymour
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
John A. Thornburg
Represented By
Jennifer N Caringal
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Juan Carlos Sanchez
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Michael Albert
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Samuel H Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Mary K Blasy
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Kenneth Dolitsky
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joe Kendall
Kendall Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Robert D Isom
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Devon E May
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
Vasu S Raja
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Defendant
American Airlines Group Inc
Represented By
Andrew B Clubok
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Dee J Kelly, Jr
Kelly Hart & Hallman
contact info
Susan Engel
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Stephen Barry
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Movant
Robert Ferrino
Dallas, TX 75254
Represented By
Lewis Kahn
Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC
contact info
John David Reed
Holmes Firm PC
contact info
James T Fetter
Kahn Swick & Foti LLC
contact info
Alexandra Pratt
Kahn Swick & Foti LLC
contact info
Ramzi Abadou
Kahn Swick & Foti LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Yazzan Qawasmi
Represented By
Stuart L Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Adam M Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Vicente Davidoff Cracasso
Represented By
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Murielle Steven Walsh
Pomerantz
contact info
Willie C Briscoe
The Briscoe Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Emily C. Finestone
Pomerantz
contact info
J Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dominik Dumancic
Represented By
Stuart L Cochran
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Morgan Michelle Embleton
Levi & Korsinsky LLP
contact info
Gregory M Potrepka
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Adam M Apton
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Shannon L Hopkins
Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Van S. Nguyen
Represented By
Jennifer N Caringal
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Juan Carlos Sanchez
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Michael Albert
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp (san Diego)
contact info
Kenneth Dolitsky
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joe Kendall
Kendall Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
60 60 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 05/12 11:52 AM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants'59 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss. The Motion is hereby GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/12/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
59 59 motion Leave to File Fri 05/09 2:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Exceed Page Limit For Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by American Airlines Group Inc (Kelly, Dee)
Related: [-]