Yakisikli vs. American Family Insurance, S.I.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-04980 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:24 AM EST |
Defendant
American Family Insurance, S.I.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Merih Yakisikli
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STATUS REPORT by American Family Insurance, S.I. (Zucco, Sarah) Modified on 4/30/2025 to add motion for extension of time to file (RO) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 04/30 6:04 PM
ORDER: In light of the status report at19 notifying the Court the parties have settled all claims in this matter in principal, the parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal or a further joint status report by May 30, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/30/2025. (RO) |
||
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
order
Mediation Status Report Order
Mon 04/28 12:27 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file a further joint status report by May 1, 2025. The parties are reminded that if a settlement is not reached, the deadline for the parties to file a joint revised discovery plan remains May 8, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/28/2025. (RO) |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STATUS REPORT by American Family Insurance, S.I. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() STATUS REPORT by American Family Insurance, S.I. (Zucco, Sarah) Modified on 4/22/2025 to add motion for extension of time to file (RO) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are directed to file a further joint status report by April 25, 2025 . If a settlement is not reached, the deadline for the parties to file a joint revised[LINK:discovery plan] is extended to May 8, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/22/2025. (RO) |
||
Friday, March 21, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/21 12:49 PM
ORDER: The16 Motion to Stay the current discovery schedule pending the outcome of mediation is granted. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by April 22, 2025 regarding the result of mediation. If mediation is unsuccessful, the parties are directed to file a joint revised[LINK:discovery plan] by April 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/21/2025. (RO) |
||
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Letter MOTION to Stay remainder of the discovery deadlines by American Family Insurance, S.I.. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Letter In Opposition to Pre-Motion Conference Letter [Response To # 14] by Merih Yakisikli (Miletti, Vincent) |
|
Monday, January 06, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by American Family Insurance, S.I.. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 12/20 3:16 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (ONF) |
||
Saturday, November 30, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint Filed against American Family Insurance, S.I., filed by Merih Yakisikli. (Miletti, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 15, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 10/15 11:23 AM
ORDER: The proposed protective order filed by Defendant American Family Insurance, S.I.12 is so ordered. To the extent that any portion of the protective order is inconsistent with this Court's procedures for sealing documents or the standards governing the ability of this Court to permit the sealing of documents, the Court's practices and standards shall be followed by the parties and will govern any dispute. The parties should follow the Individual Practices of the assigned judges in determining how to file materials under seal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/15/2024. (YEP) |
||
Monday, October 14, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Protective Order by American Family Insurance, S.I.. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2024 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 10/07 5:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The pre-motion conference scheduled for October 10, 2024, before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall is ADJOURNED to October 30, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 4H North. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 10/7/2024. (CG) |
||
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Mon 09/09 3:15 PM
ORDER: Defendant's motion7 for a pre-motion conference in anticipation of his motion to dismiss is GRANTED. A pre-motion conference shall be held before Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on October 10, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4H North. At the pre-motion conference, the Court will order a briefing schedule. The parties should anticipate a schedule that will require service of their motion within two weeks after the pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 9/9/2024. (CG) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 09/03 8:47 AM
ORDER: Defendant has filed a letter seeking "guidance"; the Court does not give legal advice. The Court has entered a schedule in the case. To the extent that Defendant intends to file a motion to dismiss or file an answer, the timing for such filings are governed by the Rules of Civil Procedure and any Individual Practices of the District Judge. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 9/3/2024. (EM) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Letter seeking guidance on how to proceed by American Family Insurance, S.I. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 08/12 10:18 AM
Minute Entry And Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara: A telephonic-initial conference was held on 8/09/2024. Plaintiff's counsel (Vincent Miletti) and Defendant's counsel (Sarah Zucco) were present. The Court adopts all the deadlines in the parties' proposed Rule 26(f) report (unless otherwise indicated on the record), and those deadlines include: time to amend pleadings or add additional parties shall be completed by 11/15/2024 ; completion of fact discovery by 3/31/2025 ; completion of experts discovery by 6/13/2025 ; the last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice will be set by District Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. As discussed on the record in light of the anticipated motion to dismiss the Court will not hold a settlement conference at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/09/2024.(Zoom Log #11:34-11:40.) (EM) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Miletti, Vincent) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic-initial conference will take place on 8/09/2024 at 11:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. The parties are to join the conference by dialing 1-646-828-7666 , Meeting ID: 161-2168-2308 , and Passcode: 542698 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Rule 26(f) Report and electronically file same with the Court no later than 8/07/2024 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the Rule 26(f) Report, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephonic initial conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/2/2024. (EM) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Letter In Opposition to the Defendants Request For a Pre Motion Conference by Merih Yakisikli (Miletti, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by American Family Insurance, S.I.. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (CV) |
|
misc
ECF Admission and Registration Notification - Removal
Fri 07/19 8:31 AM
This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (CV) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Maggie Delany on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Delany, Maggie) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Insurance, S.I. identifying Corporate Parent AmFam Holdings, Inc. for American Family Insurance, S.I.. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by American Family Insurance, S.I. (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Insurance, S.I. from Supreme Court of the State of New York Richmond County, case number 150446/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18083107) (Zucco, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
notice
Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 07/18 3:35 PM
NOTICE: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a COMPLETED Civil Cover Sheet including the SECOND PAGE (Not the Instruction Page). This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (CV) |