Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-00934

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Pamela W Mcafee
Case #: 5:24-ap-00052
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Todd Nolan Selleck, Sr.
Represented By
Todd Nolan Selleck, Sr.
contact info
Plaintiff
David Faulhaber
Represented By
Ciara L. Rogers
Waldrep Wall Babcock & Bailey PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
27 27 court Notice of Trial (Continued/Rescheduled/Resumed) Mon 04/28 1:48 PM
Notice of Continued Trial. Trial date set for 7/1/2025 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Pre-Trial Conference (Continued/Rescheduled) Mon 04/28 1:44 PM
Amended Order Continuing/Rescheduling Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge McAfee. Related [+]. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 25 Order Continuing/Rescheduling Pre-Trial Conference
25 25 order Pre-Trial Conference (Continued/Rescheduled) Mon 04/28 1:40 PM
Order Rescheduling Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/23/2025 at 10:30 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge McAfee. Related [+]. (Donnery, Erin) **Amended by docket entry26 .**Modified on 4/28/2025 (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] 21 Order Continuing/Rescheduling Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, April 25, 2025
24 24 order Amend Scheduling Order Fri 04/25 12:38 PM
Order Granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Related [+] Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures due: . Rule 26 (a)(2) Disclosures due: . Discovery due: . Motions due by 5/23/2025. (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff David Faulhaber
utility Calendar - Reschedule Fri 04/25 12:40 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Reschedule Hearing Date - 5/20/2025 Other- scheduling order amended Related [+] (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] ument no.22 Notice of Rescheduled Trial. Trial date set for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom.
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 motion Amend Scheduling Order Tue 04/22 3:41 PM
Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber Related [+]. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Scheduling Order,20 Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
22 22 court Notice of Trial (Continued/Rescheduled/Resumed) Wed 03/19 12:44 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Trial. Trial date set for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Pre-Trial Conference (Continued/Rescheduled) Wed 03/19 12:28 PM
Order Continuing/Rescheduling Pre-Trial Conference. Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge McAfee. . (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Amend Scheduling Order Wed 03/19 10:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Related [+] Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosures due: . Rule 26 (a)(2) Disclosures due: . Discovery due: March 24, 2025. Motions due by 4/23/2025. (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff David Faulhaber
utility Calendar - Reschedule Wed 03/19 10:27 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Reschedule Hearing Date - Other- scheduling order amended Related [+] (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 11/18/2024. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 12/31/2024. Discovery due: 2/17/2025. Mediation Notification due 12/31/2024. Amendment(s) due by 12/31/2024. Motions due by 3/19/2025. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge McAfee. Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2025. Trial date set for 4/16/2025 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom.
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
19 19 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Wed 03/12 2:27 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Ciara Rogers. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: An order granting the relief requested was not submitted as required by Local Rule 5005-4(4). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 3/26/2025. (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] ument no.18 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by David Faulhaber
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 motion Amend Scheduling Order Tue 03/11 11:24 AM
Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber Related [+]. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Scheduling Order,17 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 order Extend Time Wed 02/19 9:20 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, February 17, 2025
16 16 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Mon 02/17 5:00 PM
Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order, filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber Related [+]. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-] ument no.9 Scheduling Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 01/30 6:45 PM
Notice of Deposition of Todd Nolan Selleck, Sr. on February 10, 2025 filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Deposition Thu 01/30 6:44 PM
Notice of Deposition of Dianna Chalkley on February 10, 2025 filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Mediation Fri 01/17 4:55 PM
Notice of Mediation filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 01/10 11:37 AM
Order Regarding Intent to Mediate . (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Tue 11/19 11:03 AM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar 4/16 Related [+] (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-] ument no.10 Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Defendant Todd Nolan Selleck,11 Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Plaintiff David Faulhaber
Monday, November 18, 2024
11 11 misc Rule 26(a) Disclosures Mon 11/18 4:34 PM
Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 26(a) Disclosures Mon 11/18 12:55 PM
Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by Travis Sasser on behalf of Todd Nolan Selleck Sr.. (Sasser, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/17 2:58 PM
Scheduling Order. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due: 11/18/2024. Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures due: 12/31/2024. Discovery due: 2/17/2025. Mediation Notification due 12/31/2024. Amendment(s) due by 12/31/2024. Motions due by 3/19/2025. Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephone Conference/Judge McAfee. Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2025. Trial date set for 4/16/2025 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
8 8 admis Pre-Conference Report Tue 10/08 8:34 AM
Pre-Conference Report filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber Related [+]. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-] 7 Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 order Directing Filing of Joint Report Mon 09/09 1:37 PM
Order Directing Parties to File Joint Report Pre-Conference Report due by 10/9/2024. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
utility Calendar - Schedule Mon 09/09 1:30 PM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Preliminary Pre-Trial Conference (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 7:07 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Travis Sasser on behalf of Todd Nolan Selleck Sr.. (Sasser, Travis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time Mon 08/19 10:10 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 9/6/2024. (parker, roxanne)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, August 15, 2024
4 4 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 08/15 11:22 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Travis Sasser on behalf of Todd Nolan Selleck Sr. Related [+]. (Sasser, Travis)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 misc Exhibit(s) Fri 07/19 11:34 AM
Exhibit(s) filed by Ciara L. Rogers on behalf of David Faulhaber Related [+]. (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/17 8:49 PM
Summons Issued on Todd Nolan Selleck, Sr. Answer Due 08/16/2024 (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/17 8:49 PM
Adversary case 24-00052 5. Complaint by David Faulhaber against Todd Nolan Selleck, Sr. (Fee Paid) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Rogers, Ciara)
Related: [-]