New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Vera M Scanlon
Case #: 1:24-cv-04984
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Malen & Associates, P.C.
Represented By
Adam M. Hughes
Malen & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbra Panigel
Represented By
Elliot Elo
The Law Office Of Elliot M. Elo, Esq. PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/27 4:41 PM
Pursuant to the plaintiff's Notices of Voluntary Dismissal11 &12 filed on November 25, 2024, all causes of action are dismissed with prejudice against defendant Malen & Associates, P.C. Civil case terminated. (APJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/25 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbra Panigel (Elo, Elliot)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/25 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbra Panigel (Elo, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 11/19 12:02 PM
ORDER. Neither Plaintiff nor Defendant appeared at the Initial Conference scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 11/26/2024, Counsel must file a joint letter with the Court explaining their nonappearance. By the same date, Counsel must either enter a proposed discovery schedule or an explanation of why such a schedule is not necessary. See 11/13/2024 Order as to the pending motion to dismiss. (SH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Wed 11/13 3:59 PM
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the defendant's pre-motion letter concerning the anticipated motion to dismiss the complaint, ECF No.9 . Notwithstanding plaintiff's lack of reply, the Court has determined that a pre-motion conference is not necessary. The motion shall be briefed in accordance with the schedule laid out in Rule III.C. of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices. Each submission should follow the page limits in Rule III.D of the Court's Individual Rules and should be made in a single brief. The parties are encouraged not to file their motion papers and submit courtesy copies until the motion has been fully briefed, unless doing so might cause a party to miss an applicable deadline. See Rule III.C.2 of this Court's Individual Rules and Practices. Ordered by Judge Eric R. Komitee on 11/13/2024. (CFB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/30 5:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malen & Associates, P.C. (Hughes, Adam)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 08/30 4:59 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference by Malen & Associates, P.C.. (Hughes, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/13 11:17 AM
ORDER. The8 Motion for an Extension of Time is granted. On consent, Defendant will answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 8/30/2024. Corporate Defendant must file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 no later than 9/13/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/13/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/12 4:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Malen & Associates, P.C.. (Hughes, Adam)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Hughes on behalf of Malen & Associates, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Hughes, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/25 9:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbra Panigel. Malen & Associates, P.C. served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Elo, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/22 12:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is scheduled for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon via ZoomGov. To gain access to the ZoomGov audio conferencing system, the parties are to dial 1-646-828-7666; enter meeting ID 16121901090 and press the pound key; when asked for a participant ID, press the pound key; and enter passcode 091622 and press the pound key. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 11/5/2024. In the event that Defendant has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address for such Defendant and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. The Court reminds the parties of their responsibility to file a disclosure statement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, if applicable, within 30 days of appearing in this action. As to any LLC, the disclosure statement should identify all of the members and their respective citizenship. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/22/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 07/19 7:25 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 07/19 7:24 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/19 7:23 AM
Summons Issued as to Malen & Associates, P.C.. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT Barbra Panigel against Malen & Associates, P.C. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18083416 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Barbra Panigel. (Elo, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet