Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-90273

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:24-ap-03144
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Relm Insurance Ltd.
Represented By
Relm Insurance Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Banyan Risk Ltd.
Represented By
Banyan Risk Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
David Perrill
Represented By
David Perrill
contact info
Defendant
Drake Harvey, III
Represented By
Drake Harvey, III
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Wenzel
Represented By
Kyle Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Brett Kittilstved
Represented By
Brett Kittilstved
contact info
Defendant
Breanna Baker
Represented By
Breanna Baker
contact info
Plaintiff
Tribolet Advisors LLC, as Plan Administrator and Trustee for the Mining Project Wind Down Holdings, Inc. Litigation Trust
Represented By
Charles Gibbs
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
62 62 court Courtroom Minutes Fri 05/16 11:46 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:30 AM. Appearances: Minyao Wang for Relm Insurance Ltd. Margaret Lovric for Edward Drake Harvey. Colin Bernardino for David Purell. Greer Griffith for the Trustee. By docket entry, Order58 was vacated without prejudice for reasons stated on the record. Hearing is continued to May 21, 2025 at 4:00 PM. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 04:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (acj4)
Related: [-] 59 Emergency Motion (Adversary)
61 61 misc Statement Fri 05/16 11:09 AM
Statement // Notice of Hearing on Emergency Motion of Plaintiff for Reconsideration (Filed By Tribolet Advisors LLC, as Plan Administrator and Trustee for the Mining Project Wind Down Holdings, Inc. Litigation Trust ) Related [+] (Gibbs, Charles)
Related: [-] 58 Generic Order,59 Emergency Motion (Adversary)
court Hearing Set Fri 05/16 10:01 AM
Hearing Set by the Court Related [+] Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing scheduled for 5/16/2025 at 11:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 59 Emergency Motion (Adversary)
Friday, May 09, 2025
60 60 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 58 Generic Order