Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Julia K Munley
Case #: 3:24-cv-01195
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Luan Ferreira
Represented By
Gerald A. Connor
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Represented By
Melissa A. Dziak
Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Worley
Represented By
Michael Shaffer
Shaffer & Gaier, LLC
contact info
Andrew S. Abramson
Abramson Employment Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Worley
Represented By
Michael Shaffer
Shaffer & Gaier, LLC
contact info
Andrew S. Abramson
Abramson Employment Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 07, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 03/07 1:19 PM
ORDER re22 cancelling Discovery Conference and extending Case Management Dedlines. Discovery due by 5/9/2025. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 5/9/2025. Defendant Expert Report is due by 6/13/2025. Motions due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/7/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 misc Letter Thu 03/06 4:12 PM
Letter from Michael D. Shaffer, Esquire not needing Conf and requesting extension . (Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/03 1:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 3/13/2025 10:00 AM before Honorable Julia K Munley. Plaintiff to initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/3/25. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
20 20 misc Letter Fri 02/28 11:26 AM
Letter from Michael D. Shaffer, Esquire . (Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Fri 12/27 3:14 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Melissa A. Dziak - Mediator added. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/27/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/20 11:42 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT/SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due 4/25/25;Discovery due by 4/7/2025. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 4/4/2025. Defendant Expert Report is due by 5/9/2025. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/20/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/05 5:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2024 10:00 AM before Honorable Julia K Munley. Plaintiff to initiate the call; **CM PLAN filed Doc15 **. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/5/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Standing Order Thu 12/05 4:55 PM
STANDING ORDER #1 Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/5/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
15 15 misc Case Management Plan Tue 11/26 3:05 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by John Worley, Jennifer Worley, Luan Ferreira. (Connor, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/21 1:03 PM
Defendant, Luan Ferreira's ANSWER to1 Complaint of Plaintiffs, John Worley and Jennifer Worley, h/w by Luan Ferreira.(Connor, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/20 1:39 PM
ORDER directing parties to file a joint status report re posture of case w/i 10 days of this order Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 11/20/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Wed 10/16 10:37 AM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Luan Ferreira by Luan Ferreira.(Connor, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
11 11 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Mon 10/07 4:32 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Jennifer Worley, John Worley by Jennifer Worley, John Worley.(Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Wed 10/02 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald A. Connor on behalf of Luan Ferreira (Connor, Gerald)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/02 1:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Luan Ferreira. Luan Ferreira waiver sent on 7/18/2024, answer due 9/16/2024. (Connor, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Mon 09/30 1:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Worley, John Worley (Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Thu 09/12 3:22 PM
STATUS REPORT re Service of Complaint by Jennifer Worley, John Worley. (Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 09/11 3:43 PM
ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to file status report w/i 10 days of this order re1 Service of Complaint. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 9/11/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 order Special Admissions Form Approved Mon 07/22 3:56 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Michael D. Shafffer Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 7/22/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/22 3:40 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael Shaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael Shaffer is seeking special admission Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6703739.. (Shaffer, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 07/22 10:18 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Shaffer is directed to file for special admission or make arrangements to be generally admitted. (ea)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Fri 07/19 12:26 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 7/19/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/18 3:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Luan Ferreira and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against Luan Ferreira ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6700788), filed by John Worley, Jennifer Worley.(ep)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet