California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando M Olguin
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:24-cv-06037
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Paul Beserra
Represented By
Joseph Peter Esposito
Seki, Nishimura And Watase, LLP
contact info
Janet L Keuper
Seki Nishimura And Watase LLP
contact info
Nicole Rachel Castronovo
Seki, Nishimura And Watase, PLC
contact info
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Represented By
Joseph Peter Esposito
Seki, Nishimura And Watase, LLP
contact info
Janet L Keuper
Seki Nishimura And Watase LLP
contact info
Nicole Rachel Castronovo
Seki, Nishimura And Watase, PLC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard T. Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Hollie
Represented By
Brennan L.G. Hughes, Jr.
Douglas Hicks Law, Apc
contact info
Rachel Pearl Jacobs
Douglas Hicks Law, Apc
contact info
Carl Edwin Douglas
Douglas Hicks Law Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodney Hollie
Represented By
Brennan L.G. Hughes, Jr.
Douglas Hicks Law, Apc
contact info
Rachel Pearl Jacobs
Douglas Hicks Law, Apc
contact info
Carl Edwin Douglas
Douglas Hicks Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/28 4:14 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Janet L Keuper counsel for Defendants Paul Beserra, County of Los Angeles. Janet L. Keuper is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Paul Beserra. (Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/28 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicole Rachel Castronovo counsel for Defendants Paul Beserra, County of Los Angeles. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Paul Beserra. (Castronovo, Nicole)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/28 3:25 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara Marie Greco counsel for Defendants Paul Beserra, County of Los Angeles. Adding Sara M. Greco as counsel of record for Defendants, County of Los Angeles and Paul Beserra for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles and Paul Beserra. (Attorney Sara Marie Greco added to party Paul Beserra(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Marie Greco added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Greco, Sara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
27 27 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/27 1:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Stipulation26 is granted. Jury Trial continued to 2/10/2026 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued dates and deadlines.* (vdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
26 26 stip Amend/Correct Tue 03/25 4:07 PM
Joint STIPULATION to AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Hearing,20 filed by DEFENDANTS Paul Beserra, County of Los Angeles.(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order to Continue Trial and Other Related Deadlines
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
25 25 order Protective Order Tue 02/25 2:54 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo re Stipulation for Protective Order24 . (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
24 24 stip Protective Order Mon 02/24 6:04 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by DEFENDANTS County of Los Angeles, Paul Beserra.(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
23 23 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 11/19 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
22 22 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Mon 11/18 3:14 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Robert Hollie(Jacobs, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
21 21 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 10/28 11:35 AM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
20 20 19 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 10/28 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 11/18/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
19 19 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 10/21 1:33 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie.. (Jacobs, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
16 16 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 09/30 10:34 AM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 09/27 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, identifying Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie, County of Los Angeles, Paul Beserra (#512403). (Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 09/27 5:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles.(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 09/03 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Paul Beserra, identifying Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie, County of Los Angeles, Paul Beserra. (Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 09/03 4:33 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Paul Beserra answer now due 10/4/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by DEFENDANT Paul Beserra.(Attorney Janet L Keuper added to party Paul Beserra(pty:dft))(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/30 3:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles, identifying Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie, County of Los Angeles, Paul Beserra. (Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 08/30 2:57 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Los Angeles answer now due 9/27/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by DEFENDANT County of Los Angeles.(Attorney Janet L Keuper added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Keuper, Janet)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 07/25 11:51 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/19 10:19 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Paul Beserra, County of Los Angeles. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 07/19 10:16 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 07/19 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 07/19 10:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 07/18 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie, (Douglas, Carl)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 07/18 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie. (Douglas, Carl)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 07/18 2:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie. (Douglas, Carl)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 07/18 2:06 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37858869 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Hollie, Rodney Hollie. (Attorney Carl Edwin Douglas added to party Robert Hollie(pty:pla), Attorney Carl Edwin Douglas added to party Rodney Hollie(pty:pla))(Douglas, Carl)
Related: [-]