Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Patti B Saris
Case #: 1:24-cv-11847
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Covidien LP
Defendant
Sofradim Production SAS
Plaintiff
Craig Eisele
Represented By
Andrea R. Preston
Levin, Papantonio Rafferty
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 07/19 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Sofradim Production SAS. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice re: MDL Case Opened Fri 07/19 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:24-cv-11847-PBS Eisele v. Covidien LP et al. In Re: Covidien Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation No. II, MDL 3029. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 07/19 10:58 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Sofradim Production SAS, Covidien LP Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10514134 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Craig Eisele.(Preston, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet