North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:William L Osteen, Jr
Referred: Joi Elizabeth Peake
Case #: 1:24-cv-00596
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 14, 2025 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
HANESBRANDS INC.
Represented By
JERRY H. WALTERS, JR.
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Mediator
CARL HORN, III
Plaintiff
MICHAEL HALEY
Represented By
WALKER MOLLER
Siri & Glimstad, LLP
contact info
DANA STONE SMITH
Siri & Glimstad, LLP
contact info
JACK RYAN SPITZ, I
Siri & Glimstad, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility Motions Referred Fri 05/09 2:57 PM
Motion Referred: RE:16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (ads)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 motion Protective Order Wed 05/07 2:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by HANESBRANDS INC.. Response to Motion due by 5/21/2025(WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
utility Case Reassigned Thu 04/24 3:20 PM
Case Reassigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 04/15 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney KATIE ELIZABETH TOWERY on behalf of Defendant HANESBRANDS INC. ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-4066997.) (TOWERY, KATIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Fri 01/10 2:26 PM
ORDER Appointing HON. CARL HORN, III, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by Lawrence H. Cunningham, Clerk of Court. (mb)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Rule 26f - Joint Order on Motion for L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint Fri 01/10 1:50 PM
ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 01/10/2025, that the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Doc. #11 ] and Joint Local Rule 5.5 Report [Doc. #12 ] are approved as submitted and as noted herein. Discovery shall be established as Complex. Mediation should be conducted midway to late in the discovery period, the exact date to be set by the mediator after consultation with the parties. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Carl Horn, III. The parties do not consent to appointment of a magistrate judge. Trial of this case is expected to take approximately 3-5 days. A jury trial has been demanded by the plaintiff. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2025, Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2025, Discovery due by 9/30/2025, Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 1/31/2025, Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 3/3/2025. (lg)
Related: [-]
order Mediation Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 2:22 PM
MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 9/30/2025. (mb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
12 12 motion L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint Mon 12/09 9:41 AM
L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties by HANESBRANDS INC..(WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Rule 26f Report - Joint Mon 12/09 9:40 AM
Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by HANESBRANDS INC..(WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 12/09 9:54 AM
Motions Referred: RE:11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties,12 L.R. 5.5 Report-Joint filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (kg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Cancellation Mon 12/09 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Cancellation: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/24 cancelled. (kg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Parties RE: SO30 Wed 10/30 5:08 PM
Notice to Parties RE: SO30.. Response due 11/29/2024(ww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Monday, October 28, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Mon 10/28 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 12/12/2024 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (kg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/25 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by HANESBRANDS INC.. (WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/15 5:58 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for HANESBRANDS INC. Answer due by 11/5/2024. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/15/2024. (jsb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 10/11 4:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement. (WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/11 4:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by HANESBRANDS INC..(WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/11 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JERRY H. WALTERS, JR on behalf of Defendant HANESBRANDS INC. (WALTERS, JERRY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/16 2:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL HALEY. HANESBRANDS INC. waiver sent on 8/14/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (MOLLER, WALKER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 07/30 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney JACK RYAN SPITZ, I on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL HALEY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3881685.) (SPITZ, JACK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Special Appearance Tue 07/30 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney WALKER MOLLER on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL HALEY ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number ANCMDC-3881678.) (MOLLER, WALKER)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
utility Case Assigned Fri 07/19 8:31 AM
Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (kag)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Case Referred to Standing Order 30 Fri 07/19 8:34 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties., CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (kag)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Standing Order 30 Tue 07/30 9:02 AM
CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (glp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
1 1 34 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against HANESBRANDS INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCMDC-3874771.), filed by MICHAEL HALEY.(SMITH, DANA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Michael Haley Position Statement,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Michael Haley RTS Notice