California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-01226
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 13, 2025 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
WarrCloud Inc.
Represented By
Vito Anthony Costanzo
Holland And Knight
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By
Farouk G. Mansour
Godes & Preis LLP
contact info
Joseph M. Preis
Godes & Preis, LLP
contact info
Joshua Ryan Mino
Godes & Preis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 05/22 11:07 AM
ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Substitute Attorney [Doc.16 ]. Attorney Vito Anthony Costanzo terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 5/22/2025. (anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/21 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neeru Jindal on behalf of WarrCloud Inc. (Jindal, Neeru)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Substitute Attorney Wed 05/21 4:54 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by WarrCloud Inc..(Jindal, Neeru)Attorney Neeru Jindal added to party WarrCloud Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 27, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 11:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/6/2026 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/4/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/11/2026 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 2/27/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Thu 02/27 4:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference held on 2/27/2025. The case did not settle. Scheduling Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Joshua Mino). (Defendant Attorneys Vito Costanzo and Sheila Shen). (no document attached) (kxm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 01/06 3:18 PM
ORDER Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Related [+] Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 1/6/2025. (exs)
Related: [-] ECF No.12
12 12 motion Continue Mon 01/06 1:47 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc..(Mino, Joshua) (exs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Joshua R. Mino in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Joshua R. Mino
Thursday, November 07, 2024
11 11 3 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 11/07 8:18 AM
Scheduling Order Regulating Pre-Trial Proceedings and Setting Second Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/10/2025 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/6/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
10 10 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Wed 11/06 4:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 11/6/2024. The case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Joshua Mino). (Defendant Attorney Vito Costanzo). (no document attached) (mxm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 misc Joint Hearing Statement Tue 10/29 1:08 PM
JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc.. (Mansour, Farouk)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 10/29 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc. re7 Joint Hearing Statement filed by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc. . (Mino, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 misc Joint Hearing Statement Mon 10/28 6:13 PM
JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc.. (Mansour, Farouk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
6 6 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 09/04 7:58 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Video Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/6/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/3/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 09/03 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by WarrCloud Inc. . Identifying Other Affiliate WarrCloud Inc., Other Affiliate Aaron Automotive Group, Inc. dba Aaron Ford of Poway for WarrCloud Inc.. (Costanzo, Vito)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/03 11:50 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by WarrCloud Inc..(Costanzo, Vito)Attorney Vito Anthony Costanzo added to party WarrCloud Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/07 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc.. WarrCloud Inc. served. (Mino, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/18 9:05 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (jms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/18 9:00 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against WarrCloud Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19023287.), filed by Aaron Automotive Group, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1226-W-AHG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Mino, Joshua)(axc1). (jms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint