Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12685

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:14-bk-12690
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Dec 30, 2014
Claims Deadline:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Oct 07, 2019

Debtor
Bellus ALC of Colorado, LLC
24555 Hallwood Ct
Farmington Hills, MI 48335-1667
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091
Trustee
Alfred Thomas Giuliano
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091
Represented By
David William Giattino
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Ryan T. Jareck
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 12/05/2014 7:05 AM EST
Thursday, December 04, 2014
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (AK)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $335. Filed by Bellus ALC of Colorado, LLC. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-12690 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 7369605, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]