Member Case
Lead case is: 1:14-bk-12685

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:14-bk-12705
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Dec 30, 2014
Claims Deadline:Apr 06, 2015
Terminated:Oct 07, 2019

Debtor
Bellus ALC of Nevada, LLC
24555 Hallwood Ct
Farmington Hills, MI 48335-1667
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Alfred Thomas Giuliano
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091
Represented By
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Alfred Thomas Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC
contact info
David William Giattino
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Ryan T. Jareck
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899


Docket last updated: 12/05/2014 7:06 AM EST
Thursday, December 04, 2014
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (AK)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $335. Filed by Bellus ALC of Nevada, LLC. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-12705 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 7369605, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]