Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 1:14-bk-11277
Case Filed:Dec 04, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Mar 06, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jun 04, 2015
Terminated:Jul 07, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Sep 06, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Trustees of Conneaut Lake Park, Inc., Debtor
12382 Center St
Conneaut Lake, PA 16316-4804
Represented By
Jeanne S. Lofgren
Stonecipher Law Firm
contact info
George T. Snyder
Stonecipher Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Liberty Center. 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Heather A. Sprague on Behalf of the United States Trustee by
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO May 15 2018
Memorandum Opinion Signed on 5/15/2018. (RE: related document(s): 573 Motion for Sanctions for Violation of the Discharge Injunction, Motion to Enforce). cm: John Mizner, Esq., George Snyder, Esq. (mgut)

1. Judge sets Sept. 1 hearing on 123-year-old Conneaut Lake amusement park's Chapter 11 exit plan (foxbusiness.com)
Submitted Wed 08/05/2015
2. Conneaut Lake Park bankruptcy plan hearing set for Sept. 1 (centredaily.com)
Submitted Wed 08/05/2015
3. Federal bankruptcy judge to decide who controls Hotel Conneaut operations (meadvilletribune.com)
Submitted Thu 05/21/2015
4. Judge approves another $150K loan for Conneaut Lake Park to open (meadvilletribune.com)
Submitted Wed 05/20/2015
5. Conneaut Lake Park creditors push to see payment plan (goerie.com)
Submitted Mon 05/11/2015
6. Conneaut Lake Park gets 1-week extension in bankruptcy case (goerie.com)
Submitted Wed 04/29/2015
7. Conneaut Lake Park bankruptcy case to resume Tuesday (goerie.com)
Submitted Mon 04/27/2015
8. Mediation fails on Conneaut Lake Park bankruptcy (goerie.com)
Submitted Mon 04/20/2015
9. Conneaut Lake Park trustees terminate Hotel Conneaut lease (goerie.com)
Submitted Tue 04/07/2015
10. Tax exemption an issue in Conneaut Lake Park bankruptcy (goerie.com)
Submitted Mon 01/05/2015
11. Conneaut Lake Park board to file for Chapter 11 (lancasteronline.com)
Submitted Sat 12/06/2014
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
726 726 order Order -Non-motion related- Tue 11/02 12:35 PM
Text Order Signed on 11/2/2021 by Judge Jeffery Deller. Related [+]. And now, this 2nd day of November, 2021, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over the matters raised in the correspondence docketed at ECF Nos. 699 and 703. To the extent that the parties seek relief, they are directed to bring these matters before a court of competent jurisdiction (i.e., the Court of Common Pleas of Crawford County, Pennsylvania). This bankruptcy case shall remain closed because there is no basis to reopen it pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 350. (jfur)
Related: [-] :699 Document,703 Document
725 725 court Hearing Held Tue 11/02 12:32 PM
Hearing Held on 11/2/2021 on Correspondence Dated 9/14/2021 from Gloria Novak, on behalf of the Residents/Homeowners in Conneaut Lake Park [ECF No. 699] and Correspondence Dated 9/24/2021 from Patricia Hutton [ECF No. 703]. Related [+]. Text Order to be entered (jfur)
Related: [-] :699 Document filed by Interested Party Gloria Novak,703 Document filed by Patricia Hutton
Monday, November 01, 2021
724 724 misc Response -Non-motion related for attorney use- Mon 11/01 12:02 PM
Response of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to the Court's Order Dated October 26, 2021 Regarding the Hearing on 11/2/2021. Filed by Interested Party Office of Attorney General Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Related [+]. (Kovalchick, Anthony)
Related: [-] : 719 Order -Non-motion related-
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
723 723 court Document Mon 11/01 11:02 AM
Correspondence addressed to Judge Deller received from Carol Anderson. (mgut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
722 722 order Order -Non-motion related- Tue 10/26 10:08 AM
Order Signed on 10/26/2021. The anonymous letter received by the Court and docketed at ECF 721 does not comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9011, which incorporates Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court further counsels litigants that this Court is not a forum for unknown and unnamed individuals to lodge hearsay grievances. Accordingly, the letter filed at ECF 721 is STRICKEN. Related [+]. (jfur)
Related: [-] :721 Letter
721 721 court Document Tue 10/26 9:39 AM
Correspondence addressed to Judge Deller received from Anonymous Party. (mgut)
Related: [-]
720 720 court Document Tue 10/26 9:37 AM
Correspondence addressed to Judge Deller received from Patricia Hutton, Conneaut Lake Park Preservation Fund. (mgut)
Related: [-]
719 719 order Order -Non-motion related- Tue 10/26 9:24 AM
Text Order Signed on 10/26/2021 by Judge Jeffery Deller: The Court has reviewed, and appreciates, the response filed on behalf of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. To fully understand the situation at Conneaut Lake Park, the Court invites the Attorney General to advise the Court (a) whether the Attorney General is aware of any current violations of the charitable use restriction by Keldon Holdings, LLC or its agents, (b) if there are existing violations the extent to which enforcement is being sought by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in its parens patraie capacity, and (c) the manner and method by which residents in the community may transmit to the Attorney General any concerns about whether the charitable use of the property is being honored (or not honored) including the mailing address, email address, phone number, and name of the deputy to whom such concerns may be transmitted. Related [+]. (jfur)
Related: [-] :716 Response -Non-motion related for attorney use-