Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-01703
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Terminated:Feb 24, 2025
Case in other court:Hillsborough County Circuit Court, 24-CA-004611
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
ITG Communications, LLC
Represented By
Sherrill May Colombo
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Ryan Patrick Forrest
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brady Stenberg
Represented By
Angeli Murthy
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Kimberly De Arcangelis
Morgan & Morga, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Erika Rotbart
Terminated: 12/23/2024
Represented By
Erika Deutsch Rotbart
Deutsch Rotbart & Associates, PA
contact info
Mediator
Donna V. Smith
Terminated: 12/05/2024
Represented By
Donna V. Smith
Donna V. Smith, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
57 57 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 02/25 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
56 56 order Order Mon 02/24 9:28 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: In accord with the parties' stipulation (Doc. 55 ), the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each pending motion (Docs. 47 and 51 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. The clerk must close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/24/2025. (AP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
55 55 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/20 5:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Brady Stenberg. (De Arcangelis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]