Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:24-cv-00682
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 15, 2025 3:33 AM CST
Defendant
Tarrant County, Texas
Represented By
Stephen Andrew Lund
Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney
contact info
Melvin Keith Ogle
Second District Court Of Appeals
contact info
Defendant
Keefe Commissary Network LLC
Represented By
Monica Litle Goff
Carter Arnett Bennett & Perez PLLC
contact info
Stacey Cho Hernandez
Carter Arnett Bennett & Perez PLLC
contact info
Joshua J Bennett
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Keefe Group LLC
Represented By
Monica Litle Goff
Carter Arnett Bennett & Perez PLLC
contact info
Stacey Cho Hernandez
Carter Arnett Bennett & Perez PLLC
contact info
Joshua J Bennett
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cassandra Johnson
Represented By
Stephen Michael Bergren
Mccathern PLLC
contact info
David A Dekle
Ben Crump Law PLLC
contact info
Alizabeth Adam Guillot
Mccathern PLLC
contact info
Carl Lenford Evans, Jr
Mccathern Mooty Grinke LLP
contact info
Paul Ashley Grinke
Ben Crump Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aryanna Stafford
Represented By
Stephen Michael Bergren
Mccathern PLLC
contact info
David A Dekle
Ben Crump Law PLLC
contact info
Alizabeth Adam Guillot
Mccathern PLLC
contact info
Carl Lenford Evans, Jr
Mccathern Mooty Grinke LLP
contact info
Paul Ashley Grinke
Ben Crump Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 05/02 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua J Bennett for Kelly M. McCauley on behalf of Keefe Commissary Network LLC, Keefe Group LLC. (Bennett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
37 37 5 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 04/10 3:39 PM
ORDER: It is ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a settlement conference with the parties and their counsel on June 17, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. It is further ORDERED that by no later than 5:00 p.m. C.D.T. on June 13, 2025, each party shall submit a completed Confidential Settlement Conference Information Sheet. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/10/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/09 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Compliance re:35 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing filed by Keefe Commissary Network LLC, Keefe Group LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
35 35 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Thu 04/03 10:38 AM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court hereby sets a status conference, via telephone, on April 10, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/3/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/02 3:39 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties Joint33 Motion for Settlement Conference and to Extend the Mediation Deadline. Having considered the Motion and the good cause presented therein, the Motion is GRANTED. Therefore, the Court determines this case should be REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. for court-ordered mediation to be conducted no later than August 29, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/2/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Extension of Time Tue 04/01 12:46 PM
MOTION for Settlement Conference, Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Mediate() filed by Keefe Commissary Network LLC, Keefe Group LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
32 32 trial Designation of Experts Tue 04/01 9:56 AM
Designation of Experts by Keefe Commissary Network LLC, Keefe Group LLC. (Bennett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 trial Designation of Experts Fri 03/28 3:00 PM
Designation of Experts by Tarrant County, Texas. (Lund, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Mon 03/03 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: Defendants Keefe Commissary Network, L.L.C and Keefe Group, LLC's (Keefe)29 Motion to Withdraw Counsel is GRANTED. Carter Arnett PLLC and all of its lawyers, including E. Leon Carter, Monica Little Goff, and Stacey Cho Hernandez, are hereby withdrawn from the case. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/3/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
29 29 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 02/27 12:03 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Joshua J Bennett,Joshua J Bennett for Keefe Group LLC,Joshua J Bennett for Keefe Commissary Network LLC. Motion filed by Keefe Group LLC, Keefe Commissary Network LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 24, 2025
28 28 respm Reply Fri 01/24 11:35 AM
REPLY filed by Keefe Group LLC, Keefe Commissary Network LLC re:24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hernandez, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
27 27 respm Reply Wed 01/22 2:45 PM
REPLY filed by Tarrant County, Texas re:22 MOTION to Dismiss (Lund, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
26 26 respm Response/Objection Mon 01/13 5:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cassandra Johnson, Aryanna Stafford re:24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Grinke, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
25 25 respm Response/Objection Fri 01/10 10:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by Cassandra Johnson re:22 MOTION to Dismiss (Evans, Carl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
24 24 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/23 8:52 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Keefe Group LLC, Keefe Commissary Network LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hernandez, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 12/20 8:15 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tarrant County, Texas. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lund, Stephen)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Dismiss Fri 12/20 8:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tarrant County, Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lund, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/27 3:43 PM
ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL: The Court GRANTS Defendants'20 Motion. The Court ORDERS that Mr. Bennett is withdrawn as counsel of record in this matter. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/27/2024) (jnp)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/27 9:22 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Keefe Group LLC, Keefe Commissary Network LLC (Hernandez, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/25 4:35 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Keefe Commissary Network LLC, Keefe Group LLC, Tarrant County, Texas filed by Aryanna Stafford, Cassandra Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Dekle, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/13 4:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/13/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2025. Motions due by 6/30/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/30/2025. Discovery due by 5/30/2025. Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/27/2025 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/13/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order Tue 11/12 2:46 PM
Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Cassandra Johnson, Aryanna Stafford. (Grinke, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 9 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Fri 10/25 1:29 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Responses due by 11/22/2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/25/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Consolidating Cases Fri 10/25 11:25 AM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 4:24-cv-00130 consolidated with lead case 4:24-cv-00682. The Tarrant County case is designated as the lead case. The Clerk is directed to close Case No. 4:24-cv-00130. All papers filed in the Related Actions shall be filed only in Case No. 4:24-cv-00682 and shall bear the above caption. All pending motions in both cases are DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than 30 days following entry of this Order. Defendants shall respond to the Consolidated Complaint no later than 30 days after Plaintiffs filing. Order requiring updated scheduling conference to follow separately. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/25/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/23 4:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tarrant County, Texas filed by Cassandra Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Guillot, Alizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 10/11 2:22 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed12 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion is hereby GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/11/2024) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 10/10 4:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Tarrant County, Texas (Ogle, Melvin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 10/03 2:09 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that this case be REASSIGNED to Judge O'Connor for future case management. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/3/2024) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/02 7:43 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 10/24/2024. Replies due by 11/7/2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/2/2024) (JRG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/01 3:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cassandra Johnson, Aryanna Stafford (Grinke, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 09/12 8:46 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tarrant County, Texas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lund, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Sat 08/03 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Motion to Extend Time. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/3/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/02 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Return of Service re:3 Summons Issued filed by Cassandra Johnson (Guillot, Alizabeth)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time Fri 08/02 2:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time of Time filed by Tarrant County, TexasAttorney Melvin Keith Ogle added to party Tarrant County, Texas(pty:dft) (Ogle, Melvin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 19, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 07/19 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cassandra Johnson, Aryanna Stafford. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Guillot, Alizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 07/19 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Tarrant County, Texas. (mmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Pittman Fri 07/19 3:53 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/19 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Tarrant County, Texas filed by Cassandra Johnson a representative of the Estate of Trelynn D'Maun Wormley, Aryanna Stafford a/n/f/ of M.P., a minor, Cassandra Johnson. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14777292) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Guillot, Alizabeth)
Related: [-]